STICH v. SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANNE FARROLL STICH
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. and DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv13811
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 12/21/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's adjournment request for #7 motion to dismiss. The motion day is adjourned to 12/21/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/16/2020. (jdb)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Carla R. Karp re #11 Letter. (KARP, CARLA)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Margaret E. Cordner re #10 Order. (CORDNER, MARGARET)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER adjourning scheduling conference call without date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/28/2020. (jdb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Carla R. Karp, Esq. to the Hon. Zahid N. Quraishi requesting adjournment of the November 12, 2020 telephonic scheduling conference. (KARP, CARLA)
October 23, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/16/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KERNER, GLENN)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/06/2020. (jdb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal; Notice of Removal to All Adverse Parties; Disclosure Statement of Smith & Nephew, Inc.; Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(a); Civil Cover Sheet; and Application for Extension of Time served on Margaret E. Cordner on October 2, 2020, filed by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.. (KERNER, GLENN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Certification of Glenn S. Kerner Pursuant to Local Rule 10.1(a) by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.. (KERNER, GLENN)
October 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/23/2020. (abr, )
October 2, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Certification of Glenn S. Kerner Pursuant to Local Rule 10.1(a) on behalf of SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.. (KERNER, GLENN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (KERNER, GLENN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. identifying Smith & Nephew PLC as Corporate Parent.. (KERNER, GLENN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. from Superior Court of Monmouth County, case number MON-L-001168-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11443595), filed by SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KERNER, GLENN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STICH v. SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
Represented By: GLENN S. KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE FARROLL STICH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?