OSBORNE v. ETHICON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OSBORNE
Defendant: ETHICON INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 3:2020cv15092
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT L. KINSMAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (abr, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert L. Kinsman Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KINCANNON, JOSHUA)
December 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Robert L. Kinsman: $ 150, receipt number TRE116162 (mg)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting admission as to ROBERT L. KINSMAN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/09/2020. (jdb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 34 Letter from Joshua S. Kincannon to the Honorable Douglas Arpert re PHV Admission of Robert L. Kinsman, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joshua S. Kincannon in Support of Kinsman Admission PHV, #2 Certification of Robert L. Kinsman, Esq., in Support of PHV Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KINCANNON, JOSHUA)
December 1, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA S. KINCANNON on behalf of MICHAEL OSBORNE (KINCANNON, JOSHUA)
October 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. KOTT on behalf of ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (KOTT, DAVID)
October 28, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
October 28, 2020 Filing 31 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-00990. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED: Plaintiff's 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) Motion to Transfer Venue and Supporting Memorandum of Legal Authority #28 is GRANTED. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, Trenton Division, for all further proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this action immediately to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, Trenton Division, and close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/23/2020. (CSS)
October 22, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Joshua)
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Michael Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/2/2020. (REE)
March 31, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walker, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua B. Walker (Walker, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 12/7/2020 before Rodney Max.(Price, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/5/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2021, Pretrial statement due by 7/20/2021, All other motions due by 7/27/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 9/7/2021 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/4/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/5/2019. (BGS)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT re #21 Case Management Report Amended by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Joshua)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Walker, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may hold their case management report meeting telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/2/2019. (VIV)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Michael Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of compliance re 17 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Walker, Joshua)
June 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Richard McLure Dye, appearing on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056821.) Related document: #16 MOTION for Richard M. Dye, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Richard M. Dye may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendants, with Attorney Joshua B. Walker designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/31/2019. (VIV)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Richard M. Dye, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Related case(s): no (Walker, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Joshua)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson.(Walker, Joshua)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc.(Walker, Joshua) Modified on 5/29/2019 (DG).
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Michael Osborne. (Price, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Osborne. Related case(s): yes (Price, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 05/07/2019 by Michael Osborne as to Johnson & Johnson. (Price, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 05/07/2019 by Michael Osborne as to Ethicon, Inc. (Price, Robert) Modified on 5/14/2019 (DG).
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Michael Osborne. (Price, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Osborne. Related case(s): Yes (Price, Robert)
April 26, 2019 FEES paid by Michael Osborne (Filing fee $400 receipt number TPA056329). (JCG)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (DG)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-990-T-36AEP. (SJB)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by Michael Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Price, Robert) Modified on 4/25/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSBORNE v. ETHICON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC.
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OSBORNE
Represented By: JOSHUA S. KINCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?