UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAUM et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jay S. Baum and Luci Baum
Case Number: 3:2020cv15980
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 2/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BAUM, JAY)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/22/2020. (abr, ) Modified on 1/5/2021 (eaj, ).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting extension of time for Defendants to answer or otherwise move with regard to the Complaint to 1/11/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/21/2020. (mg)
December 19, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
December 19, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (BAUM, JAY)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. LUCI BAUM served on 11/21/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JAY S. BAUM served on 11/21/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GOKCE TUGCE YUREKLI on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAY S. BAUM, LUCI BAUM. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
November 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
November 12, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay S. Baum, Luci Baum, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Jay S. Baum, #3 Summons as to Luci Baum)(MILLER, EMILY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAUM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay S. Baum
Represented By: JAY S. BAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luci Baum
Represented By: JAY S. BAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: EMILY KATHERINE MILLER
Represented By: GOKCE TUGCE YUREKLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?