PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC et al
Plaintiff: PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. and ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv18328
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/01/2021. (jem)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (RHOAD, ROBERT)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
December 7, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC identifying Endo International PLC as Corporate Parent.. (RHOAD, ROBERT)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11775354), filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RHOAD, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?