AXA INSURANCE COMPANY v. BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AXA INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ASR TRUCKING LLC, BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC and MAHENDRA PATEL
Case Number: 3:2021cv01210
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY. ASR TRUCKING LLC served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MAHENDRA PATEL for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mg)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Certification on behalf of AXA INSURANCE COMPANY Re #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Certif. of Diligent Inquiry, #2 Exhibit 2 to Certif. of Diligent Inquiry, #3 Exhibit 3 to Certif. of Diligent Inquiry, #4 Exhibit 4 to Certif. of Diligent Inquiry, #5 Exhibit 5 to Certif. of Diligent Inquiry)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request for Default by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY against Defendant MAHENDRA PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Certification In Support of Pl. Request For Entry Of Defauolt)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER extending time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 4/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/4/2021. (mg)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JAMES NAST on behalf of BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC (NAST, TIMOTHY)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY as to ASR TRUCKING LLC. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY. MAHENDRA PATEL served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY. BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASR TRUCKING LLC, BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC, MAHENDRA PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY identifying AXA DELAWARE LLC as Corporate Parent.. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASR TRUCKING LLC, BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC, MAHENDRA PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12039713), filed by AXA INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXA INSURANCE COMPANY v. BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASR TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY JAMES NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAHENDRA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?