AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01260
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs; Clerk is directed to reopen this action and upon entry of this order the case and docket shall be marked closed.Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/17/2021. (mg)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/26/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/25/2021. (jmm, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
January 28, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12044795), filed by AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?