COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC v. REGAL CINEMAS, INC.
Plaintiff: COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC
Defendant: REGAL CINEMAS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02090
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/3/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2021. Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/29/2021. (mg)
March 29, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/29/2021. (kas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER ANDREW LESSER on behalf of COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC (LESSER, PETER)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by REGAL CINEMAS, INC..(BRODY, JAN)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUGGY on behalf of REGAL CINEMAS, INC. (BUGGY, CHRISTOPHER)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by REGAL CINEMAS, INC..(BRODY, JAN)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Initial Telephonic Conference set for 3/29/2021 12:00 PM Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/16/2021. (mg)
February 16, 2021 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order document #3 submitted by REGAL CINEMAS, INC. on 2/15/2021 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/2/2021. (mg)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BRODY, JAN)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REGAL CINEMAS, INC. identifying Regal Cinemas Corporation, Regal Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Regal Entertainment Group, Crown Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Crown UK HoldCo Ltd., andCineworld Group plc as Corporate Parent.. (BRODY, JAN)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REGAL CINEMAS, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID L 8108 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12098256), filed by REGAL CINEMAS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, CIS, Track Assignment Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BRODY, JAN)
February 8, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC v. REGAL CINEMAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGAL CINEMAS, INC.
Represented By: JAN ALAN BRODY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUGGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC
Represented By: PETER A. LESSER
Represented By: PETER ANDREW LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?