SONNENBERG v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC.
Plaintiff: THOMAS SONNENBERG
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02141
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERENCE, Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/15/2021. (abr, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC..(HART, THOMAS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS SONNENBERG. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (ROSENTHAL, SAMUEL)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, ) Modified on 2/17/2021 (jal, ).
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12102583) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Thomas Sonnenberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(ROSENTHAL, SAMUEL)
February 9, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 9, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SONNENBERG v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS SONNENBERG
Represented By: SAMUEL J. ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?