ALTISOURCE S.A.R.Let al v. SZUMANSKI et al
Plaintiff: ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC. and ALTISOURCE S. R.L
Defendant: HOLLY FAGAN, NORMAN REMEDIOS, JOEL PASCUA, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, SAMARA SANTOS, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, GEORGE BELLINO, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC and 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC
Cross Defendant: 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, ANTHONY DISANO, EVA CHIN, 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L. and 540 S CLINTON G LLC
Cross Claimant: MARTIN SZUMANSKI and KICHAN LEE
Counter Defendant: REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv03293
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
3 Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 2/15/2023 is canceled. The in-person settlement conference scheduled to take place on 2/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby converted to a zoom status conference before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate zoom information for the status conference at a later date. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/19/2023. (mm)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of of Service by Alexander Novak re #138 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,, by 139 WASHINGTON G LLC. (JUHASE, KIM)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney KIM STEVEN JUHASE terminated; granting #137 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney KIM STEVEN JUHASE terminated. Novak Juhase & Stern, LLP is to serve a copy of this Order on named Defendants by 1/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/13/2023. (mg)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #137 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 2/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN, KICHAN LEE. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Service)(JUHASE, KIM)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TEXT ORDER: Novak Juhase & Stern LLP shall file (1) the declaration of Alexander Novak, Esq. referenced in the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel at Docket Entry No. #132 ; and (2) proof of service of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel at Docket Entry No. #132 to Defendants Chin and Lee by no later 1/20/2023.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/12/2023. (mm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 WRITTEN STATEMENT by NORMAN REMEDIOS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlh)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CONSENT & REGISTRATION form to receive documents electronically by NORMAN REMEDIOS. (Received via Help Desk) (mlh)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by NORMAN REMEDIOS. (Received via Help Desk) (mlh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #132 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for 139 Washington G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, KICHAN LEE and Eva Chin. Motion set for 1/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for 139 Washington G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, KICHAN LEE and Eva Chin by KICHAN LEE. (JUHASE, KIM)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY #131 submitted by KIM JUHASE on 12/12/2022 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for 139 Washington G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, KICHAN LEE and Eva Chin by EVA CHIN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Novak Declaration to be relieved)(JUHASE, KIM)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2022. (jem)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 TEXT ORDER: An in-person settlement conference is hereby scheduled to take place on 2/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Clients with settlement authority, in addition to counsel, must appear in person at the conference. Clients and counsel appearing in person must comply with Standing Order 2022-02 regarding COVID protocols. Given the probability that additional Standing Orders may be entered prior to the settlement conference, counsel is directed to keep informed of same in case the requirements for appearing in person change. The Standing Orders can be found on the District Court's website at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/standing-orders. To the extent the parties wish to supplement their respective prior confidential ex parte statements for the settlement conference, the parties shall submit such supplements by no later than 2/21/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/16/2022. (mm)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TEXT ORDER: A status conference via telephone is set for 2/15/2023 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/16/2022. (mm)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Settlement Conference held on 11/15/2022. (mm)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2022. (mm)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference to discuss logistics regarding the upcoming settlement conference is set for 11/10/2022 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/7/2022. (mm)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Letter from Re-executed letter from Alexander Novak. (JUHASE, KIM)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter #126 submitted by Kim Juhase on 10/28/2022 did not contain a proper signature of the pro hac attorney. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER HAND SIGNED SIGNATURE FOR THE PRO HAC ATTORNEY. Only the e-filer can electronically sign documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Letter from Alexander Novak. (JUHASE, KIM)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/4/2022. (mg)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Confidentiality Order)(KENNY, THOMAS)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 LETTER ORDER allowing Defendant Disano and adjuster to participate in the 11/15/2022 settlement conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/19/2022. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Letter from Andrew Smith. (SMITH, ANDREW)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 8/29/2022. (mm)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Letter from Plaintiffs in Advance of Status Conference re 113 Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (KENNY, THOMAS)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TEXT ORDER: The Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2022, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 11/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in-person before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Clients with settlement authority, in addition to counsel, must appear in person at the conference. Clients and counsel appearing in person must comply with Standing Orders 2021-08 and 2022-01 regarding COVID protocols. Given the probability that additional Standing Orders may be entered prior to the settlement conference, counsel is directed to keep informed of same in case the requirements for appearing in person change. The Standing Orders can be found on the District Court's website at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/standing-orders. Should the parties agree to participate in the settlement conference over zoom, the parties must notify Chambers no later than 14 days before the conference. Parties are instructed to review judicial preferences for procedures in anticipation of the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/1/2022. (mm)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Letter from Plaintiffs re 118 Order,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,. (KENNY, THOMAS)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 TEXT ORDER: The Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2022, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 11/2/2022 at 2:00 p.m. in-person before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Clients with settlement authority, in addition to counsel, must appear in person at the conference. Clients and counsel appearing in person must comply with Standing Orders 2021-08 and 2022-01 regarding COVID protocols. Given the probability that additional Standing Orders may be entered prior to the settlement conference, counsel is directed to keep informed of same in case the requirements for appearing in person change. The Standing Orders can be found on the District Court's website at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/standing-orders. Should the parties agree to participate in the settlement conference over zoom, the parties must notify Chambers no later than 14 days before the conference. Parties are instructed to review judicial preferences for procedures in anticipation of the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/1/2022. (mm)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Letter from Alexander Novak regarding the scheduled Settlement Conference. (JUHASE, KIM)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TEXT ORDER: An in-person settlement conference is hereby scheduled to take place on 10/5/2022 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Clients with settlement authority, in addition to counsel, must appear in person at the conference. Clients and counsel appearing in person must comply with Standing Orders 2021-08 and 2022-01 regarding COVID protocols. Given the probability that additional Standing Orders may be entered prior to the settlement conference, counsel is directed to keep informed of same in case the requirements for appearing in person change. The Standing Orders can be found on the District Court's website at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/standing-orders. Should the parties agree to participate in the settlement conference over zoom, the parties must notify Chambers no later than 14 days before the conference. Parties are instructed to review judicial preferences for procedures in anticipation of the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/1/2022. (mm)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter from All Parties Requesting a Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Singh. (KENNY, THOMAS)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Letter from Plaintiffs with update on Service on Defendant Remedios re 113 Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (KENNY, THOMAS)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TEXT ORDER: No later than 7/29/2022, Plaintiff shall file an updated status report on attempts to serve Defendant Norman Remedios. A status conference via telephone is set for 8/29/2022 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/21/2022. (mm)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Letter from Plaintiffs re 108 Order,. (KENNY, THOMAS)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Exhibit to #109 Defendant's Response Brief, Corrected Exhibit A to Counsel's Certification by MARTIN SZUMANSKI. (Attachments: #1 Statement Letter to Court correcting Exhibit A to Counsel's Certification)(SURGENT, JAY)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #104 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Martin Szumanski (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KENNY, THOMAS)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Defendant's Response Brief by MARTIN SZUMANSKI. Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of Counsel Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibits E -R, #4 Exhibit Notice of CrossMotion to Amend Defendant Szumanski Counterclaim, #5 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(SURGENT, JAY)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall exchange initial disclosures no later than 5/27/2022. Plaintiff shall file a letter regarding the status of service on Defendant Norman Remedios by 6/17/2022. Defendants shall submit a request for a premotion conference before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi regarding any proposed motion to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York no later than 6/17/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/19/2022. (mm)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference held via zoom on 5/18/2022. Ordered to be entered. (mm)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Anne E. Thompson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/13/2022. (jjc, )
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Proposed Order Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs re #85 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (KENNY, THOMAS)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #104 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Martin Szumanski. Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Martin Szumanski by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KENNY, THOMAS)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against NORMAN REMEDIOS, HOLLY FAGAN, SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA, MARTIN SZUMANSKI, GEORGE BELLINO, ANTHONY DISANO, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by 540 S CLINTON G LLC, EVA CHIN, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC.(JUHASE, KIM)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against NORMAN REMEDIOS, SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA, MARTIN SZUMANSKI, GEORGE BELLINO, HOLLY FAGAN, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, ANTHONY DISANO, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by KICHAN LEE.(JUHASE, KIM)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, GEORGE BELLINO, EVA CHIN, ANTHONY DISANO, HOLLY FAGAN, KICHAN LEE, NORMAN REMEDIOS, MARTIN SZUMANSKI by SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA.(POSNER, GABRIEL)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 LETTER ORDER granting request for the Rule 16 Conference to be conducted via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/27/2022. (abr, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against SAMARA SANTOS, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, GEORGE BELLINO, EVA CHIN, ANTHONY DISANO, HOLLY FAGAN, KICHAN LEE, JOEL PASCUA, NORMAN REMEDIOS, MARTIN SZUMANSKI by 195 N 16TH EC LLC. (BERKOWITZ, MARK)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter from All Parties Requesting Virtual Rule 16 Conference re #85 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (KENNY, THOMAS)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD A. KLEIN on behalf of MARTIN SZUMANSKI (KLEIN, DONALD)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by KICHAN LEE.(JUHASE, KIM)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Debra Bodian Bernstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BERKOWITZ, MARK)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, DEBRA BODIAN BERNSTEIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg, )
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against SAMARA SANTOS, 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, GEORGE BELLINO, EVA CHIN, HOLLY FAGAN, KICHAN LEE, JOEL PASCUA, NORMAN REMEDIOS, MARTIN SZUMANSKI by ANTHONY DISANO.(SMITH, ANDREW)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee for Debra Bodian Bernstein: $ 150, receipt number NEW046541 (jr)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Debra Bodian Bernstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/14/2022. (jdg, )
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney BRUCE EGERT terminated. Attorney GABRIEL Y. POSNER for SAMARA SANTOS,GABRIEL Y. POSNER for SAMARA SANTOS,GABRIEL Y. POSNER for JOEL PASCUA,GABRIEL Y. POSNER for JOEL PASCUA added.. (POSNER, GABRIEL)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Debra Bodian Bernstein by 195 N 16TH EC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mark Berkowitz in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Debra Bodian Bernstein, #2 Certification of Debra Bodian Bernstein in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BERKOWITZ, MARK)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN.(JUHASE, KIM)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM against SAMARA SANTOS, 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., GEORGE BELLINO, EVA CHIN, ANTHONY DISANO, KICHAN LEE, JOEL PASCUA, REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC., NORMAN REMEDIOS, MARTIN SZUMANSKI by HOLLY FAGAN.(DIEHL, ROBERT)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MARTIN SZUMANSKI. (Attachments: #1 Certification Jay V. Surgent's)(SURGENT, JAY)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by 195 N 16TH EC LLC.(BERKOWITZ, MARK)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Letter from Plaintiffs Responding to Defendant's Request to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal re #84 Letter. (KENNY, THOMAS)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 2:45 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/6/2022. (abr, )
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Letter from Jay V. Surgent, Esq.. (SURGENT, JAY)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that Martin Szumanskis #35 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to Count I, Count II, Count III, Count V, Count VI; and GRANTED as to Count IV and Count VII ; Motions to Dismiss filed by Anthony Disano #36 ; Holly Fagan #38 ; 195 N 16th EC LLC #76 ; and Joel Pascua and Samara Santos #47 are GRANTED as to Count I, Count II, Count V, Count VI and Count VII; and DENIED as to Count III; Motions to Dismiss filed by 1734 N Sawyer G LLC, 201-203 E 9th G LLC, 273 Liberty Ave G LLC, 343-345 E 3rd G, LLC, 540 S Clinton G LLC, 69 South 9th G LLC, Eva Chin, and Kichan Lee #61 is DENIED as to Defendant Kichan Lee regarding Count I, Count II, Count III, Count V, Count VI; DENIED as to all other movants as to Count III; and GRANTED as to all movants as to Count VII. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/29/2022. (abr, )
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/29/2022. (abr, )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS MICHAEL KENNY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KENNY, THOMAS)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by 195 N 16TH EC LLC re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Prejudice (BERKOWITZ, MARK)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PEREZ, JASON)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Prejudice (PEREZ, JASON)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 195 N 16TH EC LLC. (BERKOWITZ, MARK)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by 195 N 16TH EC LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Mark Berkowitz, #3 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BERKOWITZ, MARK)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Motion set for 10/4/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER that time for defendant 195 N 16th EC LLC to respond to Complaint is extended to 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/19/2021. (abr, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter from Mark Berkowitz. (Attachments: #1 Executed Stipulation to adjourn time to answer to be So-Ordered)(BERKOWITZ, MARK)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN, KICHAN LEE re #61 First MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT (JUHASE, KIM)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HOLLY FAGAN re #38 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Lieu of Answer (Attachments: #1 Certification Supplemental Certification of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(DIEHL, ROBERT)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ANTHONY DISANO re #36 MOTION to Dismiss (SMITH, ANDREW)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MARTIN SZUMANSKI re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SURGENT, JAY)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA re #47 First MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EGERT, BRUCE)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA re #47 First MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EGERT, BRUCE)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. re #36 MOTION to Dismiss , #47 First MOTION to Dismiss , #38 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Lieu of Answer, #61 First MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PEREZ, JASON)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PEREZ, JASON)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER ORDER that brief in opposition are limited to 45 pages. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 7/29/2021. (abr, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Guy Alexander Novak $150, receipt number TRE120769 (jal, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice G. Alexander Novak to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (JUHASE, KIM)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, G. ALEXANDER NOVAK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Letter from Jason A. Perez re #36 MOTION to Dismiss , #47 First MOTION to Dismiss , #38 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Lieu of Answer, #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #61 First MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT. (PEREZ, JASON)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time for defendant 195 N 16th EC LLC to answer,respond or otherwise move to the Complaint until 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/23/2021. (jmh)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #61 First MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 First MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT by 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN, KICHAN LEE. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JUHASE, KIM)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Letter from Mark Berkowitz. (Attachments: #1 Executed Stipulation to adjourn time to answer to be So-Ordered)(BERKOWITZ, MARK)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by GEORGE BELLINO.(abr, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically filed by GEORGE BELLINO (abr, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to G. ALEXANDER NOVAK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/6/2021. (abr, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN, KICHAN LEE WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPERANCE FOR 195 N 16TH LLC (JUHASE, KIM)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Mazanec to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEREZ, JASON)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee a to Daniel C. Mazanec $150, receipt number TRE120255 (jal, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants 1734 N. Sawyer G LLC, Ki Chan Lee, Evan Chin, 201-203 E 9th G LLC, 195 N 16th EC LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 69 South 9th G. LLC, 540 S Clinton G LLC and 273 Liberty Ave G LLC time to answer, respond, or otherwise move with respect to the First Amended Complaint is extended to and including 7/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/29/2021. (abr, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: In light of the letters filed regarding the stipulation submitted on 6/24/2021 (Docket Entry No. 44), along with the fact that Defendants Pascua and Santos filed a motion to dismiss on 6/25/2021 (Docket Entry No. 47), the stipulation (Docket Entry No. 44) shall not be entered. Defendants Pascua and Santos' motion to dismiss, like the motions to dismiss filed by other Defendants, was set for 7/19/2021 before the District Court. The other motions to dismiss have been adjourned to 8/16/2021. The Court exercises its discretion to reset Defendants Pascua and Santos' motion to 8/16/2021 as well. See United States v. Washington, 869 F.3d 193, 220 (3d Cir. 2017) (noting that "[a]s we have often said, matters of docket control and discovery are committed to [the] broad discretion of the district court"). So Ordered by United States Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION re #34 Order, #33 Stipulation, by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (PEREZ, JASON)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's time to file an opposition to any motion filed by defendants is extended to 8/2/2021; Defendants time to file a reply to Plaintiffs' opposition is hereby extended to 8/9/2021 (abr, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #47 First MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
June 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter re #40 Stipulation and Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(EGERT, BRUCE)
June 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter from Bruce Egert. (EGERT, BRUCE)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Letter re #45 Letter, #44 Stipulation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(PEREZ, JASON)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 First MOTION to Dismiss by SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief)(EGERT, BRUCE)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE EGERT on behalf of SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA (EGERT, BRUCE)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Letter from Bruce Egert re #44 Stipulation. (EGERT, BRUCE)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION re #39 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (PEREZ, JASON)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN, KICHAN LEE. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pro Hac Vice certification)(JUHASE, KIM)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #43 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION re #36 MOTION to Dismiss , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #38 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Lieu of Answer, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (PEREZ, JASON)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel C. Mazanec. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/23/2021. (abr, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer the First Amended Complaint to and including 6/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/22/2021. (abr, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION extend time to answer or move by SAMARA SANTOS, JOEL PASCUA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(EGERT, BRUCE)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #38 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Lieu of Answer. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in Lieu of Answer by HOLLY FAGAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief Fagan Brief ISO MTD, #2 Certification Fagan MTD Cert of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Ex A Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex B Cert of Counsel - Parness v. Christie_ 2015 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 109917, #5 Exhibit Ex C Cert of Counsel -Liberty Bell Bank v. Rogers_ 726 Fed. Appx. 147, #6 Exhibit Ex D Cert of Counsel -Grant v. Turner_ 2011 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 49120, #7 Exhibit Ex E Cert of Counsel -Amos v. Franklin Fin. Servs. Corp._ 509 Fed. Appx. 165, #8 Exhibit Ex F Cert of Counsel -Germinaro v. Fid. Nat_l Title Ins. Co._ 737 Fed. Appx, #9 Exhibit Ex G Cert of Counsel -Kennedy Funding_ Inc. v. Lion_s Gate Dev._ LLC_ 2006 U, #10 Exhibit Ex H Cert of Counsel -Kievit v. Rokeach_ 1987 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 16131, #11 Exhibit Ex I Cert of Counsel -Grippi v. Spalliero_ 2008 N.J. Super. Unpub. LEXIS 2754, #12 Exhibit Ex J Cert of Counsel -Twp. of Marlboro v. Scannapieco_ 545 F. Supp. 2d 452, #13 Exhibit Ex K Cert of Counsel -Dist. 1199P Health & Welfare Plan v. Janssen_ L.P._ 200, #14 Exhibit Ex L Cert of Counsel -Wolinetz v. Weinstein_ 2019 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 675, #15 Text of Proposed Order Fagan MTD - Proposed Form of Order, #16 Certificate of Service Fagan MTD Cert of Service)(DIEHL, ROBERT)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by MAXWELL L. BILLEK on behalf of ANTHONY DISANO (BILLEK, MAXWELL)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss , #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by ANTHONY DISANO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, ANDREW)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by MARTIN SZUMANSKI. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SURGENT, JAY)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that Defendants time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to 7/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/14/2021. (abr, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY by 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC, EVA CHIN, KICHAN LEE. (JUHASE, KIM)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #32 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARTIN SZUMANSKI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/15/2021. (abr, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SURGENT, JAY)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #30 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOLLY FAGAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/17/2021. (abr, )
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason A. Perez, #2 Declaration Daniel C. Mazanec, #3 Statement No Brief Necessary, #4 Proposed Order)(PEREZ, JASON)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Holly Fagan.. (DIEHL, ROBERT)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANTHONY DIEHL on behalf of HOLLY FAGAN (DIEHL, ROBERT)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for defendant 195 N 16th EC LLC to answer is extended to 6/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/2/2021. (abr, )
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION to extend time to answer, respond or move with respect to the Complaint by 195 N 16TH EC LLC. (BERKOWITZ, MARK)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK BERKOWITZ on behalf of 195 N 16TH EC LLC (BERKOWITZ, MARK)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JAMES VALVANO, II terminated. Attorney JASON A. PEREZ for ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC.,JASON A. PEREZ for ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L.,JASON A. PEREZ for REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. added.. (PEREZ, JASON)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ANTHONY DISANO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/15/2021. (abr, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #24 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time filed by JAY SURGENT on 5/27/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Proposed Order. PLEASE RESUBMIT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (abr, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Proposed Order by MARTIN SZUMANSKI. (SURGENT, JAY)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY V. SURGENT on behalf of MARTIN SZUMANSKI (SURGENT, JAY)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Anthony Disano. Attorney ANDREW LOUIS SMITH for ANTHONY DISANO added. (SMITH, ANDREW)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. 201-203 E 9TH G LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. 1734 N SAWYER G LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. EVA CHIN served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. 195 N 16TH EC LLC served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. HOLLY FAGAN served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. KICHAN LEE served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. JOEL PASCUA served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. SAMARA SANTOS served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. GEORGE BELLINO served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request for Summons to be Issued by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. as to 139 WASHINGTON G LLC, 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC, 540 S CLINTON G LLC, 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. ANTHONY DISANO served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. MARTIN SZUMANSKI served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter from counsel for Plaintiffs re #6 Amended Complaint,,. (VALVANO, JAMES)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAMARA SANTOS, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, GEORGE BELLINO, EVA CHIN, ANTHONY DISANO, HOLLY FAGAN, KICHAN LEE, JOEL PASCUA, NORMAN REMEDIOS, MARTIN SZUMANSKI, 139 Washington G LLC, 69 South 9th G LLC, 540 S Clinton G LLC, 273 Liberty Ave G LLC, filed by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC., ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L., REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms & Conditions, #2 Exhibit B - Impacted Properties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(VALVANO, JAMES)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (VALVANO, JAMES)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC. identifying Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (VALVANO, JAMES)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALTISOURCE S. R.L identifying Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (VALVANO, JAMES)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAMARA SANTOS, 1734 N SAWYER G LLC, 195 N 16TH EC LLC, 201-203 E 9TH G LLC, 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC, GEORGE BELLINO, EVA CHIN, ANTHONY DISANO, HOLLY FAGAN, KICHAN LEE, JOEL PASCUA, NORMAN REMEDIOS, MARTIN SZUMANSKI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This case was incorrectly opened using office code 8(Miscellaneous) and assigned civil action no. 8:21-cv-3293. This case has been copied to Trenton and assigned a new civil action no. 3:21-cv-3293. In the future, please refrain from using office code 8(Miscellaneous). Also, when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12174143), filed by ALTISOURCE S. R.L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(VALVANO, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALTISOURCE S.A.R.Let al v. SZUMANSKI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY FAGAN
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY DIEHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN REMEDIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL PASCUA
Represented By: BRUCE EGERT
Represented By: GABRIEL Y. POSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 195 N 16TH EC LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Represented By: MARK BERKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 201-203 E 9TH G LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMARA SANTOS
Represented By: BRUCE EGERT
Represented By: GABRIEL Y. POSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 343-345 E 3RD G, LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE BELLINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 69 SOUTH 9TH G LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 273 LIBERTY AVE G LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: 1734 N SAWYER G LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ANTHONY DISANO
Represented By: ANDREW LOUIS SMITH
Represented By: MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: EVA CHIN
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: 139 WASHINGTON G LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ALTISOURCE S.A.R.L.
Represented By: JAMES VALVANO, II
Represented By: JASON A. PEREZ
Represented By: THOMAS MICHAEL KENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: 540 S CLINTON G LLC
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: MARTIN SZUMANSKI
Represented By: JAY V. SURGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: KICHAN LEE
Represented By: KIM STEVEN JUHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTISOURCE ONLINE AUCTION, INC.
Represented By: JAMES VALVANO, II
Represented By: JASON A. PEREZ
Represented By: THOMAS MICHAEL KENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTISOURCE S. R.L
Represented By: JAMES VALVANO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: REALHOME SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES VALVANO, II
Represented By: JASON A. PEREZ
Represented By: THOMAS MICHAEL KENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?