LLOYD v. PNEUMO ABEX LLC et al
Plaintiff: HELGA LLOYD
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC, CBS CORPORATION, VIACOM INC., ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED A, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, HERCULES, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-75, H.M. ROYAL INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, CRANE CO. and PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv05054
Filed: March 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Middlesex County Courthouse*56 Paterson StreetNew Brunswick, NJ 08903 State No: MID-L-1552-21. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jdb, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER remanding to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 03/25/2021. (jdb)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Remand to State Court by PNEUMO ABEX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting Joint Stipulation to Remand Action to State Court)(VIOLA, ROY)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (BLOW, DAVID)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (KEALE, CHRISTOPHER)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (TANENBAUM, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (TANENBAUM, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (TANENBAUM, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY identifying General Electric Company as Corporate Parent.. (TANENBAUM, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by CRANE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Designation of Trial Counsel)(PASCARELLA, LISA)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by OLIVIA PEARL KELLY on behalf of HELGA LLOYD (KELLY, OLIVIA)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES MICHAEL KRAMER on behalf of HELGA LLOYD (KRAMER, JAMES)
March 15, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
March 15, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Defendants were not added to the docket. When entering parties make sure to add ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS as found on the original state court complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
March 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PNEUMO ABEX LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-001552-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12261050), filed by PNEUMO ABEX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice to State Court of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(VIOLA, ROY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LLOYD v. PNEUMO ABEX LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERCULES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.M. ROYAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELGA LLOYD
Represented By: VALERE LAURENCE NASSIF
Represented By: OLIVIA PEARL KELLY
Represented By: JAMES MICHAEL KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?