KIRKWOOD et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD KIRKWOOD and CHRISTY S. KIRKWOOD
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv05973
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12284570) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHRISTY S. KIRKWOOD, RICHARD KIRKWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JIMENEZ, PRISCILLA)
March 19, 2021 Member Case Direct File on 3/19/2021, for MDL 2738 (kas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIRKWOOD et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD KIRKWOOD
Represented By: PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTY S. KIRKWOOD
Represented By: PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?