ORTIZ v. CALLAHAN et al
Plaintiff: ASHLEY ORTIZ
Defendant: VERONICA ALLENDE, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, MARC DENNIS and GURBIR S. GREWAL
Case Number: 3:2021cv11146
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion reset for 8/16/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by VERONICA ALLENDE, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, GURBIR S. GREWAL. Responses due by 7/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(VOMACKA, MICHAEL)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER granting Defendants' request for extension; Answer due 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/17/2021. (mg)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Defendants re: Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (with Consent). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VOMACKA, MICHAEL)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASHLEY ORTIZ. MARC DENNIS served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BARKHA PATEL on behalf of VERONICA ALLENDE, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, GURBIR S. GREWAL (PATEL, BARKHA)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint for Defendants Callahan, Allende, Grewal.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(VOMACKA, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL EZRA VOMACKA on behalf of VERONICA ALLENDE, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, GURBIR S. GREWAL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOMACKA, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by VERONICA ALLENDE, GURBIR S. GREWAL, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/18/2021. (jmh)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASHLEY ORTIZ. VERONICA ALLENDE served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; PATRICK J. CALLAHAN served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; MARC DENNIS served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; GURBIR S. GREWAL served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Patrick Callahan, #2 Certificate of Service Veronica Allende, #3 Certificate of Service Marc Dennis)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VERONICA ALLENDE, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, MARC DENNIS, GURBIR S. GREWAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VERONICA ALLENDE, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, MARC DENNIS, GURBIR S. GREWAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12457722) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ASHLEY ORTIZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit D (PART 1), #5 Exhibit D (PART 2), #6 Exhibit D (PART 3), #7 Exhibit D (PART 4) LAST, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORTIZ v. CALLAHAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERONICA ALLENDE
Represented By: MICHAEL EZRA VOMACKA
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK J. CALLAHAN
Represented By: MICHAEL EZRA VOMACKA
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S. GREWAL
Represented By: MICHAEL EZRA VOMACKA
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY ORTIZ
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?