SHAPIRO et al v. WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BETH SHAPIRO and ROBERT SHAPIRO
Defendant: SOPKO MOVERS, INC. and WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv11609
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (FREIREICH, JAY)
June 29, 2021 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Initial Conference scheduled for 7/27/2021 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been cancelled pending decision on #6 Motion to Dismiss. (ijf, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/25/2021. (jjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George W. Wright, #2 Exhibit Bill of Lading, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 14, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of All Defendants (PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 7/27/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/4/2021. (ijf, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wheaton World Wide Moving, Inc. and Sopko Movers, Inc... (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
May 24, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SOPKO MOVERS, INC., WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/15/2021. (jem)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOPKO MOVERS, INC., WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOPKO MOVERS, INC., WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Div., Somerset County, case number SOM-L-420-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12483215), filed by SOPKO MOVERS, INC., WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WRIGHT, GEORGE)
May 21, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )
May 21, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAPIRO et al v. WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOPKO MOVERS, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEATON WORLD WIDE MOVING, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH SHAPIRO
Represented By: JAY J. FREIREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SHAPIRO
Represented By: JAY J. FREIREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?