HOVDET v. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Plaintiff: IONA HOVDET
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
In Re: FOSAMAX (ALENDRONATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II)
Case Number: 3:2021cv11793
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IONA HOVDET. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (LUMAGHI, LAURA)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp. on 5/27/2021 by IONA HOVDET. Waiver of Service due by 7/26/2021. (LUMAGHI, LAURA)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA G. LUMAGHI on behalf of IONA HOVDET (LUMAGHI, LAURA)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, )
May 27, 2021 Member Case Direct File on 5/26/2021, for MDL 2243 Party FOSAMAX (ALENDRONATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II) added. (mg, )
May 27, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12497823) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IONA HOVDET. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(D'ARCY, ANDREW)
May 26, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: The Nature of Suit for MDL 2243 direct files is 367 (Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability). The Cause of Action is 28:1332 Diversity Product Liability. The Jury Demand should be for Plaintiff ONLY. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOVDET v. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IONA HOVDET
Represented By: ANDREW J. D'ARCY
Represented By: LAURA G. LUMAGHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: FOSAMAX (ALENDRONATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?