KLEIN v. PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC et al
Plaintiff: TZVI KLEIN
Defendant: PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC and SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS
Case Number: 3:2021cv12171
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN MICHAEL SHER on behalf of PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC (SHER, BRIAN)
July 22, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/10/2021. (abr, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Phyton Talent Advisors LLC.. (BEAUFORT, BRIA)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC (BEAUFORT, BRIA)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TZVI KLEIN. SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. (BUZZARD, LUCAS)
July 14, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/28/2021. (abr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST,CARLYLE WAYNE EDWARDS-BALFOUR for SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS added. (LINTHORST, THOMAS)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLYLE WAYNE EDWARDS-BALFOUR on behalf of SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS (EDWARDS-BALFOUR, CARLYLE)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST on behalf of SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS (LINTHORST, THOMAS)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC, SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
June 7, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by TZVI KLEIN as to PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC, SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BUZZARD, LUCAS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC, SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12522560) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TZVI KLEIN.(BUZZARD, LUCAS)
June 4, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLEIN v. PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TZVI KLEIN
Represented By: LUCAS COLIN BUZZARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHYTON TALENT ADVISORS LLC
Represented By: BRIAN MICHAEL SHER
Represented By: BRIA S. BEAUFORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIETE GENERALE AMERICAS
Represented By: THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST
Represented By: CARLYLE WAYNE EDWARDS-BALFOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?