PUJARA et al v. THAKKER BROTHERS LLC et al
Plaintiff: JAY THAKKAR and DARSHAN PUJARA
Defendant: CHITRESH THAKKAR and THAKKER BROTHERS LLC doing business as DESI TASTY GRILL
Case Number: 3:2021cv12483
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
2 Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 11/30/2021 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/5/2021. (ijf, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CHITRESH THAKKAR, THAKKER BROTHERS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Extending Time To Answer)(ARMSTRONG, TRACY)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/2021. (jem)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHITRESH THAKKAR, THAKKER BROTHERS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHITRESH THAKKAR, THAKKER BROTHERS LLC d/b/a Desi Tasty Grill ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12542788), filed by DARSHAN PUJARA, JAY THAKKAR. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SALAMAN, ROBERT)
June 14, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUJARA et al v. THAKKER BROTHERS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHITRESH THAKKAR
Represented By: TRACY A. ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THAKKER BROTHERS LLC doing business as DESI TASTY GRILL
Represented By: TRACY A. ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY THAKKAR
Represented By: ROBERT D. SALAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARSHAN PUJARA
Represented By: ROBERT D. SALAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?