HIRSCH v. ADLER et al
Plaintiff: ELLIOT M. HIRSCH
Defendant: AMBER ADLER and HESHY TISCHLER
Case Number: 3:2021cv12686
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs; Dismissing and Consolidating Plaintiff's Complaint for case No. 21-12686, with case No. 21-12246; Directing Plaintiff to file a comprehensive amended complaint in case 21-12246 which includes all claims and factual allegations against Beda, Missry, Tawil, Adler, and Tischler, within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/8/2021. (jmh)
July 8, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmh)
June 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. Magistrate Judge Z. N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. (mg)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jal, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by ELLIOT M. HIRSCH (jal, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Application IFP)(jal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2021: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (jal, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIRSCH v. ADLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER ADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HESHY TISCHLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIOT M. HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?