SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: John Cook, Jr., PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC, MICROBILT CORPORATION, Philip N. Burgess, Jr. and Walter Wojciechowski
Case Number: 3:2021cv12971
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Received as to John Sten, Jason Moreau, and Allison McFarland: $ 450, receipt number TRE121277 (jmh)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Initial Conference set for 11/22/2021 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/10/2021. (ijf, )
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, RICHARD L. SCHEFF, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Scheff to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GORDON, DANIELLA)
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICROBILT CORPORATION identifying N/A as Corporate Parent.. (GORDON, DANIELLA)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC identifying Princeton Alternative Funding Management as Corporate Parent.. (GORDON, DANIELLA)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PHILIP N. BURGESS, JR., JOHN COOK, JR., MICROBILT CORPORATION, PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC, WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI.(GORDON, DANIELLA)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting pro hac vice admissions as to Allison McFarland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/6/2021. (abr, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting pro hac vice admissions as to Jason C. Moreau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/6/2021. (abr, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting pro hac vice admissions as to John A. Sten. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/6/2021. (abr, )
July 23, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Richard Scheff: $ 150, receipt number TRE120734 (abr, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. All Defendants. (SMITH, JAMES)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(GORDON, DANIELLA)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(GORDON, DANIELLA)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(GORDON, DANIELLA)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Richard L. Scheff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/6/2021. (abr, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(GORDON, DANIELLA)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLA GORDON on behalf of PHILIP N. BURGESS, JR., JOHN COOK, JR., MICROBILT CORPORATION, PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC, WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, DANIELLA)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLA GORDON on behalf of PHILIP N. BURGESS, JR., JOHN COOK, JR., MICROBILT CORPORATION, WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, DANIELLA)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD KROVATIN on behalf of PHILIP N. BURGESS, JR., JOHN COOK, JR., MICROBILT CORPORATION, WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI (KROVATIN, GERALD)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILIP N. BURGESS, JR., JOHN COOK, JR., MICROBILT CORPORATION, PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC, WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
June 25, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Cook, Jr., MICROBILT CORPORATION, PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC, Philip N. Burgess, Jr., Walter Wojciechowski with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cook, Jr.
Represented By: DANIELLA GORDON
Represented By: GERALD KROVATIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING LLC
Represented By: DANIELLA GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROBILT CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIELLA GORDON
Represented By: GERALD KROVATIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip N. Burgess, Jr.
Represented By: DANIELLA GORDON
Represented By: GERALD KROVATIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Wojciechowski
Represented By: DANIELLA GORDON
Represented By: GERALD KROVATIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: JAMES E SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?