KOREYVA v. BANK OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: STANLEY J. KOREYVA, JR.
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA and PNC BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv14082
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by DEANNE J LOWDEN on behalf of STANLEY J. KOREYVA, JR (LOWDEN, DEANNE)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff's Attorney requesting ajournment re #4 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (MASELLI, PAUL)
September 14, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Case was closed in error on 9/9/2021 and has been reopened. (eaj, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Summons to be Issued by STANLEY J. KOREYVA, JR as to PNC BANK, N.A.. (LOWDEN, DEANNE)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC BANK, N.A., filed by STANLEY J. KOREYVA, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B and C)(MASELLI, PAUL)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting Bank of America's #6 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; Granting Plaintiff's Cross #9 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/9/2021. (abr, ) Modified on 9/14/2021 (eaj, ).
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from plaintiff's counsel re #9 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(MASELLI, PAUL)
September 8, 2021 Set deadlines as to the #9 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by STANLEY J. KOREYVA, JR. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to proposed Amended complaint, #4 Exhibit Red-Lined Proposed Amended Complaint, #5 Brief, #6 Supplement Unreported Decision, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(MASELLI, PAUL)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (LOWDEN, DEANNE)
August 17, 2021 Set deadlines as to the #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/20/2021 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for September 21, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by BANK OF AMERICA. Responses due by 8/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Philip A. Goldstein, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
August 10, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 3:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/26/2021. (abr, )
July 26, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/13/2021. (abr, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by BANK OF AMERICA. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA from Superior Court of the State of New Jersey, Law Division, Monmouth County, case number MON-L-002185-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12656079), filed by BANK OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
July 23, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )
July 23, 2021 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOREYVA v. BANK OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY J. KOREYVA, JR.
Represented By: PAUL J. MASELLI
Represented By: DEANNE J LOWDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Represented By: PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?