CONOPCO, INC. v. WBM, LLC
Plaintiff: CONOPCO, INC. doing business as UNILEVER
Defendant: WBM, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv14205
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: proposed Consent Order re Clerk's Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ROY GORDON on behalf of WBM, LLC (GORDON, ROY)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Default by CONOPCO, INC. against WBM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 2, 2021 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to WBM, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jdb)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CONOPCO, INC.. WBM, LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 AO120 Trademark Form filed. Re #1 complaint (jal, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WBM, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of CONOPCO, INC. (LOWER, J.)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONOPCO, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WBM, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12664644) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CONOPCO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 27, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONOPCO, INC. v. WBM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONOPCO, INC. doing business as UNILEVER
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBM, LLC
Represented By: ROY GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?