COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC v. REGAL CINEMAS, INC.,
Plaintiff: COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC
Defendant: REGAL CINEMAS, INC.,
Case Number: 3:2021cv14264
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUGGY terminated. (BUGGY, CHRISTOPHER)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Jan Alan Brody, Esq. to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. re: Status Update re 6 Order on Oral Motion. (BRODY, JAN)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by REGAL CINEMAS, INC.,.(BRODY, JAN)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER directing counsel to advise by 8/31/2021 as to the status of their selection of a mediator and the date for mediation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/18/2021. (ijf, )
August 18, 2021 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Initial Conference scheduled for 9/2/2021 has been cancelled. (ijf, )
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman for all further proceedings. Judge Zahid N. Quraishi, Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/2/2021. (jjc, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 9/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/30/2021. (eh, )
July 29, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUGGY on behalf of REGAL CINEMAS, INC., (BUGGY, CHRISTOPHER)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REGAL CINEMAS, INC., identifying Regal Cinemas Corporation, Regal Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Regal Entertainment Group, Crown Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Crown UK HoldCo Ltd., and Cineworld Group plc as Corporate Parent.. (BRODY, JAN)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REGAL CINEMAS, INC., from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID LT 2063 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12668530), filed by REGAL CINEMAS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BRODY, JAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC v. REGAL CINEMAS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMERCE CENTER NB, LLC
Represented By: ADAM NACHMANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGAL CINEMAS, INC.,
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUGGY
Represented By: JAN ALAN BRODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?