MAX FRANCHISING, LLC et al v. DEMARTINO
Plaintiff: MAX FRANCHISING, LLC and MAX IP, LLC
Defendant: JOSEPH DEMARTINO doing business as The MAX CHALLENGE of Avon and ABC CORPS. 1-5
Case Number: 3:2021cv14307
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' correspondence filed on September 20, 2021. (ECF No. #13 .) The Court understands from Plaintiffs' correspondence that Defendant DeMartino will close his business by September 24, 2021. (ECF No. #13 .) By Friday, September 24, 2021, the parties shall e-file joint correspondence proposing three dates and times for a telephone conference in this matter to occur the week of September 26, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/21/2021. (gxh)
September 21, 2021 14 Text Order sent to Defendant DeMartino via regular mail. (gxh)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Steven T. Keppler. (KEPPLER, STEVEN)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance filed by JOSEPH DEMARTINO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2021. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. (Court Reporter: Cathy Ford) (gxh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Steven Keppler re 9 Order,, Set Hearings,. (KEPPLER, STEVEN)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference with the parties on August 20, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to circulate dial-in information to the Court and initiate the call. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/17/2021. (gxh)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Steven Keppler re 5 Order,,. (KEPPLER, STEVEN)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Steven Keppler re #6 Letter. (KEPPLER, STEVEN)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Steven T. Keppler re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (KEPPLER, STEVEN)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Plaintiffs' Application for an Order to Show Cause, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction. (ECF No. #2 .) Upon review of the docket, it does not appear that counsel has filed proof of service in this matter. By Friday, August 6, 2021, Plaintiffs' counsel shall e-file correspondence on the status of service. Upon service of Defendants, the parties shall e-file joint correspondence proposing three dates and times for a telephone conference in this matter. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/30/2021. (gxh)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael A. Shipp for all further proceedings. Judge Anne E. Thompson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2021. (jjc, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOSEPH DEMARTINO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Klein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Brief, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(KEPPLER, STEVEN)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12669995), filed by MAX FRANCHISING, LLC, MAX IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. C to Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. D. to Verified Complaint)(KEPPLER, STEVEN)
July 29, 2021 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )
July 29, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )
July 29, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the deadlines set for the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by the Clerk's office on was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jjc)
July 29, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAX FRANCHISING, LLC et al v. DEMARTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAX FRANCHISING, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN TODD KEPPLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAX IP, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN TODD KEPPLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH DEMARTINO doing business as The MAX CHALLENGE of Avon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?