STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC. v. TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35
Plaintiff: STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35
Counter Defendant: ALAN GLICKMAN
Case Number: 3:2021cv14565
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Conference is set for 11/4/2021 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/29/2021. (eh, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALAN GLICKMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOYCE, CHARLES)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35 as to ALAN GLICKMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOYCE, CHARLES)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Teamsters Union Local No. 35 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC. by TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(JOYCE, CHARLES)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES THOMAS JOYCE on behalf of TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35 (JOYCE, CHARLES)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC.. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12685742) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC..(MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
August 3, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )
August 3, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC. v. TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARR TRANSIT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 35
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS JOYCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: ALAN GLICKMAN
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS JOYCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?