UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LIEBER
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ANTHONY LIEBER
Case Number: 3:2021cv15085
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Anthony Lieber. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kristina M. Portner, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PORTNER, KRISTINA)
September 21, 2021 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ANTHONY LIEBER for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jdb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. ANTHONY LIEBER served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (PORTNER, KRISTINA)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTHONY LIEBER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
August 11, 2021 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANTHONY LIEBER, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(PORTNER, KRISTINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LIEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: KRISTINA PORTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY LIEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?