SADRGILANY et al v. T-MOBILE USA, INC.
Plaintiff: HASSAN SADRGILANY and DEBORAH DAMES
Defendant: T-MOBILE USA, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv16155
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/7/2021. (jdb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION /Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings Pending the JPML's Ruling on Transfer by T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SELIGMANN, READE)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time, until 10/28/2021, for T-Mobile to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/29/2021. (jdb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS on behalf of DEBORAH DAMES, HASSAN SADRGILANY (AYERS, CHRISTOPHER)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint /Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to Complaint by T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T-MOBILE USA, INC. identifying T-Mobile US, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN on behalf of T-MOBILE USA, INC. (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. MELTZER on behalf of DEBORAH DAMES, HASSAN SADRGILANY (MELTZER, JOSEPH)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HASSAN SADRGILANY. T-MOBILE USA, INC. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to T-MOBILE USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T-MOBILE USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12753980) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HASSAN SADRGILANY, DEBORAH DAMES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 27, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )
August 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SADRGILANY et al v. T-MOBILE USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HASSAN SADRGILANY
Represented By: KEVIN G. COOPER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: JOSEPH H. MELTZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH DAMES
Represented By: KEVIN G. COOPER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: JOSEPH H. MELTZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-MOBILE USA, INC.
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?