HAQQ v. WARREN COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: Jeremiah P Haqq and JEREMIAH P. HAQQ
Defendant: WARREN COUNTY and WARREN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Case Number: 3:2021cv17202
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Defendant's #3 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint until 12/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/12/2021. (abr, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WARREN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FAHRNEY, R.)
October 7, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by WARREN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER. (FAHRNEY, R.)
September 21, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WARREN COUNTY, WARREN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER from Superior Court of NJ, Warren County, Law Division, case number WRN-L-268-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12815537), filed by WARREN COUNTY, WARREN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER.(FAHRNEY, R.)
September 20, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 20, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAQQ v. WARREN COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah P Haqq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMIAH P. HAQQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN COUNTY
Represented By: R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Represented By: R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?