SHARIFI v. COUNTY OF MERCER et al
Plaintiff: PARASTU SHARIFI
Defendant: COUNTY OF MERCER, TOWNSHIP OF EAST WINDSOR, EAST WINDSOR MUNICIPAL COURT, EAST WINDSOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, E.W. P.O. JOHN CATE, E.W. SGT. DAVID OLEKSY, COURT ADMINISTRATOR KELLI HAND, MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR ROBERT JANZEKOVICH, N.J. DIVISION OF CIVIL RIGHTS, BOROUGH OF HIGHTSTOWN, HIGHTSTOWN MUNICIPAL COURT, HIGHTSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT, HIGHTSTOWN P.O. JOEL TOWNSEND and JUDGE SETH KURS
Case Number: 3:2021cv18097
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BOROUGH OF HIGHTSTOWN, HIGHTSTOWN MUNICIPAL COURT, HIGHTSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT, SETH KURS, JOEL TOWNSEND re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Court/pro se Plaintiff)(BUSSEL, TRACY)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Defendants #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by PARASTU SHARIFI (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jmh)
November 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
November 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by BOROUGH OF HIGHTSTOWN, HIGHTSTOWN MUNICIPAL COURT, HIGHTSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT, SETH KURS, JOEL TOWNSEND. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion, #2 Certification of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A-I, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BUSSEL, TRACY)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL on behalf of BOROUGH OF HIGHTSTOWN, HIGHTSTOWN MUNICIPAL COURT, HIGHTSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT, SETH KURS, JOEL TOWNSEND (BUSSEL, TRACY)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF HIGHTSTOWN, JOHN CATE, COUNTY OF MERCER, EAST WINDSOR MUNICIPAL COURT, EAST WINDSOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, KELLI HAND, HIGHTSTOWN MUNICIPAL COURT, HIGHTSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT, ROBERT JANZEKOVICH, SETH KURS, N.J. DIVISION OF CIVIL RIGHTS, DAVID OLEKSY, JOEL TOWNSEND, TOWNSHIP OF EAST WINDSOR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
October 15, 2021 COMPLAINT filed see docket entry #1 (abr, )
October 15, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number TRE122413 (abr, )
October 10, 2021 Filing 4 Pro se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically filed by PARASTU SHARIFI. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (jal)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jal)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARIFI v. COUNTY OF MERCER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARASTU SHARIFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF MERCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF EAST WINDSOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST WINDSOR MUNICIPAL COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST WINDSOR POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.W. P.O. JOHN CATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.W. SGT. DAVID OLEKSY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURT ADMINISTRATOR KELLI HAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR ROBERT JANZEKOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.J. DIVISION OF CIVIL RIGHTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF HIGHTSTOWN
Represented By: TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHTSTOWN MUNICIPAL COURT
Represented By: TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHTSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHTSTOWN P.O. JOEL TOWNSEND
Represented By: TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE SETH KURS
Represented By: TRACY BROOKE BUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?