P.F. et al v. OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: P.F. and K.F.
Defendant: OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv19315
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 2/10/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/15/2021. (eh, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN S. BALLARD on behalf of OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION (BALLARD, ROBIN)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION.(BALLARD, ROBIN)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint and Summons served on Ocean Township Board of Education, Respondent on November 1, 2021, filed by K.F., P.F.. (FERNICOLA, PAUL)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12926393) with JURY DEMAND, filed by G. E. F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FERNICOLA, PAUL)
October 26, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.F. et al v. OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.F.
Represented By: PAUL V. FERNICOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.F.
Represented By: PAUL V. FERNICOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ROBIN S. BALLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?