ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv20553
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/24/2022. (jal) Modified on 1/25/2022 (jal, ).
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(WIXTED, GERALD)
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Hartford Financial Services Group as Corporate Parent.. (WIXTED, GERALD)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD D. WIXTED on behalf of TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (WIXTED, GERALD)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER ANTHONY WUJCIAK, JR on behalf of ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (WUJCIAK, PETER)
January 10, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/24/2022. (abr, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Attorney THOMAS E. SCHORR for TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY added. (SCHORR, THOMAS)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Patrick Jones on 12/20/2021, filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (MORIARTY, KAREN)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (MORIARTY, KAREN)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13049144), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Subcontract Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Twin City Atlas Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Zurich JJA Policy, #5 Exhibit E - Tender Letter to Atlas, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(MORIARTY, KAREN)
December 16, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KAREN H. MORIARTY
Represented By: PETER ANTHONY WUJCIAK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GERALD D. WIXTED
Represented By: THOMAS E. SCHORR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?