SULLIVAN v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: EMMA SULLIVAN
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00116
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 27 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. re #8 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen A. Confoy, #2 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN)
March 1, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FELDMAN, LAURA)
March 1, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Bijan Esfandiari, receipt number TRE125102. (jem)
March 1, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BIJAN ESFANDIARI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
February 22, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Laura Feldman on 2/21/2022 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmh, )
February 21, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FELDMAN, LAURA)
February 17, 2022 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/17/2022. (eh, )
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT ORDER: Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Bijan Esfandiari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/17/2022. (jal)
February 17, 2022 Filing 23 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff;s Unopposed Motion for Admission of Bijan Esfandiari by EMMA SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Feldman, #2 Affidavit Bijan Esfandiari, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FELDMAN, LAURA)
February 17, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nicole K. H. Maldonado to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13194527.) (FELDMAN, LAURA)
February 17, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, NICOLE MALDONADO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
February 17, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #23 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff;s Unopposed Motion for Admission of Bijan Esfandiari. Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bijan Esfandiari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/16/2022. (jal)
February 16, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari. Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
February 16, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DINO S. SANGIAMO, CHRISTINA L. GAARDER, ALLYSON MILLER JULIEN and EDWARD J. DUMOULIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
February 15, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edward J. Dumoulin, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13189295.) (CONFOY, KAREN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Allyson Miller Julien, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13189276.) (CONFOY, KAREN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christina L. Gaarder, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13189260.) (CONFOY, KAREN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dino S. Sangiamo, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13189235.) (CONFOY, KAREN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari by EMMA SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Feldman, #2 Affidavit Bijan, #3 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FELDMAN, LAURA)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER: Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Allyson Miller Julien and Edward J. Dumoulin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/15/2022. (jal)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER: Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Dino S. Sangiamo, Esq. and Christina L. Gaarder, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/15/2022. (jal) Modified on 2/16/2022 (jem).
February 15, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Allyson Miller Julien, Esq. and Edward J. Dumoulin, Esq. for by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Karen A. Confoy, Esq., #2 Certification of Allyson Miller Julien, Esq., #3 Certification of Edward J. Dumoulin, Esq., #4 Proposed Consent Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(CONFOY, KAREN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Dino S. Sangiamo, Esq. and Christina L. Gaarder, Esq. for by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Karen A. Confoy, Esq., #2 Certification of Dino S. Sangiamo, Esq., #3 Certification of Christina L. Gaarder, Esq., #4 Proposed Consent Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(CONFOY, KAREN)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole K.H. Maldonado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/15/2022. (jal)
February 14, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court. Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an adjournment of the #8 Motion to Remand return date until 3/21/2022. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/11/2022. (jmh)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from Karen A. Confoy re #8 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court. (CONFOY, KAREN)
February 10, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court. Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court by EMMA SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(FELDMAN, LAURA)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole K. Maldonado by EMMA SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nicole Mal, #2 Declaration Laura Feldman, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FELDMAN, LAURA)
February 2, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole K. Maldonado. Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. DAROCI on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (DAROCI, STEVEN)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 2/17/2022 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/18/2022. (eh, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(CONFOY, KAREN)
January 11, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Counsel did not add herself to the docket as representing the defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
January 11, 2022 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (CONFOY, KAREN)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Certification on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (CONFOY, KAREN)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, case number MON-L-004022-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13099815). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA SULLIVAN
Represented By: LAURA A. FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Represented By: STEVEN J. DAROCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Represented By: STEVEN J. DAROCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?