INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL 400 v. DUARTE
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL 400
Defendant: LUIS A DUARTE
Case Number: 3:2022cv02852
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Monmouth County Courthouse71 Monument ParkFreehold, NJ 07728-1266 State No: MON L 742 22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jal, )
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER remanding this action to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Monmouth County. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/6/2022. (jal, ) Modified on 6/23/2022 (jal, ).
June 6, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Matthew J. Giacobbe, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order to Remand Matter)(GIACOBBE, MATTHEW)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/26/2022. (jdg)
May 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LUIS A DUARTE.(GIACOBBE, MATTHEW)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, by LUIS A DUARTE. (GIACOBBE, MATTHEW)
May 18, 2022 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht)
May 17, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LUIS A DUARTE from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, case number MON-L-742-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-13413845), filed by LUIS A DUARTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(GIACOBBE, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL 400 v. DUARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL 400
Represented By: MARK E. BELLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS A DUARTE
Represented By: MATTHEW J. GIACOBBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?