COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC., v. MARRIOT HOTEL SERVICES, INC
Defendant: RYMAN HOSPILTALITY PROPERTIES, INC. doing business as GAYLORD HOTELS and MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.
Counter Defendant: COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,
Case Number: 3:2022cv02895
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Georgette Castner
Referring Judge: Lois H Goodman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Rudner by MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kevin S. Mann in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Rudner, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MANN, KEVIN)
July 14, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Rudner. Motion set for 8/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John C. Josefsberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/13/2022. (abr, )
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Initial Conference set for 9/9/2022 at 9:30 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/12/2022. (ijf, )
July 12, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John C. Josefsberg by MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kevin S. Mann in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Josefsberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MANN, KEVIN)
July 12, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John C. Josefsberg. Motion set for 8/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 Amended COUNTERCLAIM and Demand for Jury Trial against COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,, filed by MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(MANN, KEVIN)
July 7, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff Withdrawing Motion to Seal re #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Complaint and Entirety of Exhibit A to Complaint. (BERMAN, BRETT)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER substituting Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. in place of Defendant Ryman Hospitality Properties Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/5/2022. (jdg)
July 1, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. identifying Marriott International, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MANN, KEVIN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC., by MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(MANN, KEVIN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN S. MANN on behalf of MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MANN, KEVIN)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and Order Substituting Party Defendant and Amending Case Caption by RYMAN HOSPILTALITY PROPERTIES, INC., MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (MANN, KEVIN)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,. RYMAN HOSPILTALITY PROPERTIES, INC. served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (BERMAN, BRETT)
May 19, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Complaint and Entirety of Exhibit A to Complaint. Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Order to Seal Portions of Complaint and Entirety of Exhibit A to Complaint by COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC., re #5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Complaint and Entirety of Exhibit A to Complaint. (BERMAN, BRETT)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Portions of Complaint and Entirety of Exhibit A to Complaint by COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett Berman, #2 Exhibit with Proposed Redactions, #3 Certificate of Service)(BERMAN, BRETT)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE E. GETZ on behalf of COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC., (GETZ, MELANIE)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,. (BERMAN, BRETT)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RYMAN HOSPILTALITY PROPERTIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RYMAN HOSPITALITY PROPERTIES, INC. D/B/A GAYLORD HOTELS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-13419341) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERMAN, BRETT)
May 18, 2022 Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht)
May 18, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint #1 submitted by BRETT ADAM BERMAN on 5/18/2022 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (kht, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC., v. MARRIOT HOTEL SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: COMMVAULT SYSTEMS, INC.,
Represented By: MELANIE E. GETZ
Represented By: BRETT ADAM BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYMAN HOSPILTALITY PROPERTIES, INC. doing business as GAYLORD HOTELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN S. MANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?