U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. NOVO NORDISK, INC.
Plaintiff: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION and UNITED STATES EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK, INC.
Case Number: 3:2022cv03482
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. (dm)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY ANNE CRUZ on behalf of UNITED STATES EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (CRUZ, KIMBERLY)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. NOVO NORDISK, INC. waiver sent on 6/6/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (CORRALES, EDUMIN)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NOVO NORDISK, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CORRALES, EDUMIN)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. NOVO NORDISK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: EDUMIN CORRALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: KIMBERLY ANNE CRUZ
Represented By: EDUMIN CORRALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?