SULLIVAN v. SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Defendant: SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Petitioner: REGIONAL DIRECTOR SUZANNE SULLIVAN and SUZANNE SULLIVAN
Case Number: 3:2022cv04336
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint,, by SUZANNE SULLIVAN. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
July 26, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint,, . Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice admission as to Colleen P. Breslin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/20/2022. (jdg)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 9/19/2022). Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/20/2022. (kas)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from James J. Gillespie, Esq.. (GILLESPIE, JAMES)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER that Respondent shall file opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Relief #1 no later than 07/22/2022, and Petitioner shall file a reply no later than 07/29/22. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/8/2022. (kas)
July 8, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/1/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SUZANNE SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sponsor Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order, #3 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice Applicant Affidavit, #4 Certification Certification of Service)(SANTIAGO, SAULO)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 Certification on behalf of SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. Re #1 Complaint,,. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ISAAC SOLOMON on behalf of SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (SOLOMON, DAVID)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES JOHN GILLESPIE on behalf of SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (GILLESPIE, JAMES)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN RONALD VREELAND on behalf of All Defendants (VREELAND, JOHN)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER that by no later than 07/08/2022 Petitioner shall file her certificate of service for the Petition for Injunctive Relief and accompanying application for emergent relief #1 . So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 07/06/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION To Use Affidavit re #1 Complaint,, by SUZANNE SULLIVAN. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
July 5, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION To Use Affidavit re #1 Complaint,, . Motion set for 8/1/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
July 1, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The motion filed in docket entry #1 -4 should have been filed using the event motion under Motions and Related Filings. Please resubmit the motion. (jal, )
June 29, 2022 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht)
June 29, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, by SUZANNE SULLIVAN. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., filed by SUZANNE SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit RD Affidavit in Support of Petition, #3 Brief Brief In Support of Petition, #4 Motion to Try on Affidavits, #5 Affidavit Affidavits in Support of Petition, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order for Expedited Briefing on Try on Affidavits, #7 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Try on Affidavits, #8 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Injunction, #9 Letter to Clerk, #10 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause)(SANTIAGO, SAULO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REGIONAL DIRECTOR SUZANNE SULLIVAN
Represented By: SAULO SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUZANNE SULLIVAN
Represented By: SAULO SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERV BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?