TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE et al v. BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE and INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Defendant: BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC and BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINTING, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv05477
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
2 Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC.(KUGELMAN, WILLIAM)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for extension of time to answer or otherwise reply until 11/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/19/2022. (jal, ) Modified on 10/19/2022 (jal, ).
October 19, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC has been DENIED. This request has been sent to Chambers for further review. (jal, )
October 18, 2022 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Brave Industrial Paint LLC a/k/a Brave Industrial Paint, LLC.. (KUGELMAN, WILLIAM)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. (FEEHAN, W.)
September 27, 2022 Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE. (FEEHAN, W.)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE. (FEEHAN, W.)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13680501), filed by TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FEEHAN, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE et al v. BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINT LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM RAYMOND KUGELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAVE INDUSTRIAL PAINTING, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM RAYMOND KUGELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, VACATION FUND, AND PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?