ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. et al v. ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A. and PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A. doing business as ATLANTIC MEDICAL GROUP and AMG
Defendant: ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, ALL BE HEALTHY, LLC, NICHOLAS BUFANO, 1-10 JOHN DOES, ABC ENTITIES (1-10), JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC ENTITIES 1-10 and AMG ORTHOPEDICS doing business as ALL BE HEALTHY LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv05669
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER that, given the status of the parties' efforts to resolve this matter and the multiple adjournments granted by the Court, the hearing scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 10:00 a.m. will be conducted in person in Courtroom 4W in Trenton. Counsel and representatives from each party with full settlement authority are to appear in person for the hearing. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/18/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER that, in response to the parties' joint letter #32 , the Court hereby ADJOURNS the preliminary injunction hearing previously scheduled for 11/18/2022 to 11/22/2022 at 10:00 A.M. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/18/2022. (kas )
November 17, 2022 Filing 33 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
November 17, 2022 Filing 32 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER that by no later than 11/17/2022 at 12:00 p.m., the parties are to file a joint letter advising as to the status of their efforts to resolve this matter. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/16/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER that, in response to Plaintiffs' letter #29 , the Court hereby ADJOURNS the preliminary injunction hearing previously scheduled for 11/08/2022 to 11/18/2022 at 10:00 A.M. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/07/2022.(Gonzalez, P)
November 4, 2022 Filing 29 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (MCHATTIE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: In response to Plaintiff's letter #26 and Defendants' letter #27 , the Court will adjourn the Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for tomorrow, 11/01/2022, one week to 11/08/2022 at 10:00 AM. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/31/2022(kas)
October 31, 2022 Filing 27 Letter from Defendants. (SHEFLIN, MICHAEL)
October 31, 2022 Filing 26 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (MCHATTIE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER that in response to Defendants' letter request #24 , the Court agrees to defer entry of a 60-day Order of Dismissal. By 1:00 p.m. today the parties are to confirm that they agree to adjourn the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for tomorrow, 11/01/2022. By 11/04/2022, the parties are to file a letter advising the Court as to the status of their settlement discussions. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/31/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
October 27, 2022 Filing 24 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (MCHATTIE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER that the Preliminary Injunction hearing is hereby adjourned to 11/1/2022 at 10:00 AM. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/25/2022. (kas)
October 25, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction #1 held via ZOOM on 10/25/2022. Adjourned to 11/1/2022 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM. (Court Reporter, Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319) (kas, ) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/26/2022) (kas).
October 21, 2022 Filing 21 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed Plaintiffs letter #18 asking to proceed with the 10/25/2022 hearing via Zoom for the Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction #5 . The Court is persuaded and will proceed with the hearing via Zoom on 10/25/2022 as scheduled. Counsel are to meet and confer regarding a proposed schedule for the hearing, including the approximate length of the parties' respective presentations and the identification of any witnesses to be called. A joint letter providing this information shall be filed by no later than 5:00 p.m. today. The parties are to have a representative with full settlement authority immediately available by telephone during the hearing. The parties are also advised to be prepared to discuss an appropriate bond, should one be warranted. Finally, the parties are instructed to send three (3) courtesy copies of their submissions on the Order to Show Cause to the chambers of the undersigned for delivery by 10/24/2022. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/21/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
October 20, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A. re #5 Order to Show Cause. (MCHATTIE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 20, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (MCHATTIE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed the parties submissions in anticipation of the 10/25/2022 hearing for the Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction #5 , and finds that an in-person hearing is warranted. A party representative with full settlement authority is Ordered to appear for the hearing. The parties are to meet and confer and by no later than 12:00 p.m. on 10/21/2022 they are to file a joint letter advising of their availability over the next three weeks. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/20/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEF IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (MCHATTIE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 18, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The BRIEF #15 submitted by MICHAEL GATTONI on 10/17/2022 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jal, )
October 17, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEF In Reply to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER that in light of defense counsel's request at ecf. #13 , the Preliminary Injunction hearing on October 25 will be held virtually for all parties. A link will be provided for the hearing. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/14/2022. (kas)
October 13, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from Defendants re #5 Order to Show Cause. (SILBERBERG, JASON)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, AMG ORTHOPEDICS, NICHOLAS BUFANO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(SILBERBERG, JASON)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER granting request for extension of Defendants deadline to file opposition to the OSC to 10/10/2022; Plaintiffs deadline to reply to 10/17/2022. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/6/2022. (jal, )
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Defendants re #5 Order to Show Cause. (SILBERBERG, JASON)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON NATHANIEL SILBERBERG on behalf of ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, AMG ORTHOPEDICS, NICHOLAS BUFANO (SILBERBERG, JASON)
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, CIVIL COVER SHEET, REPORT, ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED, MEMORANDUM OF LAW, PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CERTIFICATIONS, EXHIBITS served on NICHOLAS BUFANO on 09/27/2022, filed by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, CIVIL COVER SHEET, REPORT, ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED, MEMORANDUM OF LAW, PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CERTIFICATIONS, EXHIBITS served on ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC on 09/27/2022, filed by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE, CIVIL COVER SHEET, REPORT, ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED, MEMORANDUM OF LAW, PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CERTIFICATIONS, EXHIBITS served on AMG ORTHOPEDICS on 09/27/2022, filed by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
September 26, 2022 Set Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2022. (km)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 10/25/2022 11:00 AM in Trenton in-person- Courtroom 4W before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi.. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/26/2022. (kht)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABC ENTITIES 1-10, ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, AMG ORTHOPEDICS, NICHOLAS BUFANO, JOHN DOES 1-10. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2022: #1 AO120) (mlh, ).
September 26, 2022 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mlh)
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A. identifying Atlantic Health System, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement AMG Corporate Disclosure)(GATTONI, MICHAEL)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC ENTITIES (1-10), ALL BE HEALTHY, LLC, ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, NICHOLAS BUFANO, 1-10 JOHN DOES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13706802) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Certification Certification of M. Shusteris, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to Certification of M. Shusteris, #5 Certification Certification of N. Molinaro, #6 Certification Certification of M. McDonald, #7 Certification Certification of Dr. Hubbard, #8 Certification Certification of M. Gattoni, #9 Certificate of Service Certification of Service, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(GATTONI, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. et al v. ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL VINCENT GATTONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL VINCENT GATTONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRACTICE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP, P.A. doing business as ATLANTIC MEDICAL GROUP and AMG
Represented By: MICHAEL VINCENT GATTONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: JASON NATHANIEL SILBERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL BE HEALTHY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS BUFANO
Represented By: JASON NATHANIEL SILBERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-10 JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG ORTHOPEDICS doing business as ALL BE HEALTHY LLC
Represented By: JASON NATHANIEL SILBERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?