LANE v. LOCAL 827 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: KAREN LANE
Defendant: LOCAL 827 I.B.E.W., AFL-CIO, JOHN DOE 1-5 and JOHN DOE ENTITY 1-5
Case Number: 3:2022cv06412
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (LAGRECA, PETER)
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by LOCAL 827 I.B.E.W., AFL-CIO re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibits A - F, #3 Certificate of Service)(MADSEN, MATTHEW)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of the docket. Counsel for both Plaintiff, Karen Lane, and Defendant, Local 827 I.B.E.W., AFL-CIO, filed correspondence with the Court. (ECF Nos. #6 , #7 .) Defendant should respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #5 ) prior to filing any anticipated Motion to Dismiss. The parties are further instructed to meet and confer regarding any issues with counsel and conflicts. The parties shall raise any issues regarding Counsel and/or conflicts before the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, the magistrate judge in this matter. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/16/2022. (jdb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff requesting telephone conference re #6 Letter. (LAGRECA, PETER)
November 11, 2022 Filing 6 Letter re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (MADSEN, MATTHEW)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by KAREN LANE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LAGRECA, PETER)
November 10, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 12/5/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(mg)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1 by LOCAL 827 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MADSEN, MATTHEW)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOCAL 827 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, AFL-CIO. (MADSEN, MATTHEW)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOCAL 827 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, AFL-CIO from Superior Court of Mercer County, case number MER-L-1673-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13800905), filed by LOCAL 827 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(MADSEN, MATTHEW)
November 2, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer #3 filed by Matthew Madsen on 11/2/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application And Clerks Order To Extend Time to Answer USING Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents - Application And Clerks Order To Extend Time to Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
November 2, 2022 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANE v. LOCAL 827 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN LANE
Represented By: PETER C. LAGRECA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCAL 827 I.B.E.W., AFL-CIO
Represented By: MATTHEW BRUCE MADSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE ENTITY 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?