B.Y.C.C. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: B.Y.C.C.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2022cv06586
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 6 Certification of Natalie J. Kraner on behalf of B.Y.C.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KRANER, NATALIE)
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.Y.C.C.. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 11/16/2022, answer due 1/15/2023. (KRANER, NATALIE)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE ASHLEY on behalf of B.Y.C.C. (ASHLEY, STEPHANIE)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION To Proceed Under Pseudonym by B.Y.C.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of B.Y.C.C., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KRANER, NATALIE)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13824207), filed by B.Y.C.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KRANER, NATALIE)
November 14, 2022 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mlh)
November 14, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION To Proceed Under Pseudonym . Motion set for 12/19/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
November 14, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION To Proceed Under Pseudonym . Motion reset for 12/19/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. ***Motion was reset before proper judge. (mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.Y.C.C. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.Y.C.C.
Represented By: NATALIE JANET KRANER
Represented By: STEPHANIE ASHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?