DZIBELA v. BLACKROCK, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KURT DZIBELA
Defendant: BLACKROCK, INC., LAWRENCE FINK, JOHN DOES 1-25 and ABC COMPANY 1-5
Case Number: 3:2023cv02093
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC COMPANY 1-5, BLACKROCK, INC., LAWRENCE FINK, JOHN DOES 1-25, filed by KURT DZIBELA.(BERUTTI, RONALD)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting request to file Third Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss be withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 6/9/2023. (mlh)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proposed Order by KURT DZIBELA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BERUTTI, RONALD)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Ronald A. Berutti requesting a two week adjournment of Motion to Dismiss. (BERUTTI, RONALD)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER granting request for adjournment of the #5 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/22/2023. (jal, )
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (BERUTTI, RONALD)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The "LETTER RULE 7.1" #6 filed by THOMAS GRASSO on 5/16/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a "LETTER" and contains an improper signature. Only counsel appearing in the case are permitted to file documents electronically. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE "LETTER RULE 7.1" using the correct account and USING THE EVENT: Civil Events -> Other Filings -> Other Documents -> Letter Rule 7.1. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Ronald A. Berutti requesting adjournment of motion to dismiss. (GRASSO, THOMAS)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by BLACKROCK, INC., LAWRENCE FINK. Responses due by 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LINTHORST, THOMAS)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LAWRENCE FINK and BLACKROCK, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/4/2023. (mlh)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (mlh)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by NEEDHY SHAH on behalf of BLACKROCK, INC., LAURENCE FINK (SHAH, NEEDHY)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (LINTHORST, THOMAS)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLACKROCK, INC., LAURENCE FINK identifying BlackRock, Inc., as Corporate Parent.. (LINTHORST, THOMAS)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAURENCE FINK, BLACKROCK, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Monmouth County, case number MON-L-797-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14245546), filed by LAURENCE FINK, BLACKROCK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LINTHORST, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DZIBELA v. BLACKROCK, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT DZIBELA
Represented By: RONALD A. BERUTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKROCK, INC.
Represented By: NEEDHY SHAH
Represented By: THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE FINK
Represented By: THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST
Represented By: NEEDHY SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?