SMITH v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TRACEY SMITH
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2023cv20136
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Shipp
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Member Case Direct File on 9/11/2023, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jxh, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km, )
October 3, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Notice of Short Form Complaint filed by Priscilla Jimenez on 9/12/2023 was filed in the incorrect case. Please file the Notice of Short Form Complaint in the MAIN MDL (16-md-2738). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Short Form Complaint, for member case 20136, by TRACEY SMITH (JIMENEZ, PRISCILLA)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14676774) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TRACEY SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JIMENEZ, PRISCILLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY SMITH
Represented By: PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?