TRUIST BANK v. CMS ORDERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TRUIST BANK
Defendant: CMS ORDERS, LLC, ALMA BANK, N.A., APPLE BANK, N.A., WSFS BANK, N.A., SANTANDER BANK, N.A., T.D. BANK, N.A., INVESTORS BANK, N.A., SIGNATURE BANK, N.A., CITIZENS BANK, N.A., LAKELAND BANK, N.A., CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE, FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A., ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK, FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A., TRUSTCO BANK, N.A., METROPOLITAN COMMERCIAL BANK, N.A., NORTH EAST COMMUNITY BANK, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2024cv09562
Filed: October 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Robert Kirsch
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2024 Filing 51 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by CMS ORDERS, LLC against Signature Bank; Lakeland Bank; Santander Bank; Apple Bank; Alma Bank; Trustco Bank; Metropolitan Commercial. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
November 25, 2024 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Signature Bank; Lakeland Bank; Santander Bank; Apple Bank; Alma Bank; Trustco Bank and Metropolitan Commercial for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jal, )
November 25, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #50 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Jeremy Zacharias on 11/22/2024 was submitted prematurely as a Motion for Entry of Default. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING Civil Events - Court Events - Other Events - Clerks Entry of Default. The Clerk's office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
November 22, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION for Entry of Default by CMS ORDERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CONSENT ORDER further extending the time for Interpleader Defendant FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Interpleader Complaint until 12/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/21/2024. (mlh)
November 21, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . Motion set for 12/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
November 20, 2024 Filing 48 MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by CMS ORDERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $352,184.60. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/19/2024. (jal, )
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONSENT ORDER granting extension of time until 12/2/2024 for Interpleader Defendant TD BANK, N.A. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Interpleader Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/12/2024. (mlh)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal as to AXOS BANK, N.A. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 11/4/2024. (amv)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Israel Discount Bank of New York's application for an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Israel Discount Bank of New York shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/2/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/04/2024. (jem)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONSENT ORDER that Defendants CITIZENS BANK and INVESTORS BANK have until 12/2/2024, to answer or otherwise plead Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/4/2024. (kht)
November 1, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Axos Bank, N.A. Only by TRUIST BANK (KERNER, JUSTIN)
November 1, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #40 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
October 31, 2024 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HOENSCH, FRED)
October 31, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by TRUIST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 31, 2024 Filing 39 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric Lee, Esquire to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15775394.) (ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
October 31, 2024 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERIC LEE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (amv)
October 30, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Counsel is reminded when filing a #37 corporate disclosure statement to please enter the corporate party and/or affiliates when prompted to do so. DISCOUNT BANCORP, INC. and IDB LTD. have been added as corporate parents for Israel Discount Bank New York. This is for informational purposes only. (jjc, )
October 29, 2024 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WSFS BANK, N.A. identifying WSFS Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (DZARA, DAVID)
October 29, 2024 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK. (VERNA, ANTHONY)
October 29, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. VERNA, III on behalf of ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK (VERNA, ANTHONY)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CONSENT ORDER granting extension of time until 12/2/2024 for Defendant WSFS BANK, N.A. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the interpleader Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/28/2024. (mlh)
October 28, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #32 "NOTICE OF APPEARANCE" submitted by JENNIFER ANN HARRIS on 10/25/2024 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (mlh)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/25/2024. (jal, )
October 25, 2024 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T.D. BANK, N.A. identifying TD Bank US Holding Company as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
October 25, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANN HARRIS on behalf of T.D. BANK, N.A. (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
October 25, 2024 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. CITIZENS BANK, N.A. served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 25, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID V. DZARA on behalf of WSFS BANK, N.A. (DZARA, DAVID)
October 25, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER WEIR, JR on behalf of WSFS BANK, N.A. (WEIR, WALTER)
October 25, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #28 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by T.D. BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/11/2024. (jal, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 28 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to TD Bank, N.A... (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT ORDER granting extension of time until 12/2/2024 for Interpleader Defendant FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Interpleader Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2024. (mlh)
October 22, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 22, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. TRUSTCO BANK, N.A. served on 10/11/2024, answer due 11/1/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 17, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. AXOS BANK, N.A. served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 16, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. NORTH EAST COMMUNITY BANK served on 10/11/2024, answer due 11/1/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 16, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. METROPOLITAN COMMERCIAL BANK, N.A. served on 10/15/2024, answer due 11/5/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 16, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 15, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. APPLE BANK, N.A. served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 14, 2024 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMS ORDERS, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
October 14, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by CMS ORDERS, LLC.(ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
October 11, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. ALMA BANK, N.A. served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. SIGNATURE BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. WSFS BANK, N.A. served on 10/9/2024, answer due 10/30/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. T.D. BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. LAKELAND BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. INVESTORS BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 11, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUIST BANK. SANTANDER BANK, N.A. served on 10/9/2024, answer due 10/30/2024. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by FRED W. HOENSCH on behalf of FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (HOENSCH, FRED)
October 10, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. BERG on behalf of FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (BERG, JAMES)
October 10, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #6 Notice of Appearance submitted by Fred Hoensch on 10/10/2024 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (kht)
October 9, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
October 8, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CMS ORDERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A)(ZACHARIAS, JEREMY)
October 3, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALMA BANK, N.A., APPLE BANK, N.A., AXOS BANK, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE, CITIZENS BANK, N.A., CMS ORDERS, LLC, FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A., FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A., INVESTORS BANK, N.A., ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., LAKELAND BANK, N.A., METROPOLITAN COMMERCIAL BANK, N.A., NORTH EAST COMMUNITY BANK, SANTANDER BANK, N.A., SIGNATURE BANK, N.A., T.D. BANK, N.A., TRUSTCO BANK, N.A., WSFS BANK, N.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
October 3, 2024 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (amv)
October 1, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUIST BANK identifying TRUIST FINANCIAL CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALMA BANK, N.A., APPLE BANK, N.A., AXOS BANK, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE, CITIZENS BANK, N.A., CMS ORDERS, LLC, FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A., FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A., INVESTORS BANK, N.A., ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., LAKELAND BANK, N.A., METROPOLITAN COMMERCIAL BANK, N.A., NORTH EAST COMMUNITY BANK, SANTANDER BANK, N.A., SIGNATURE BANK, N.A., T.D. BANK, N.A., TRUSTCO BANK, N.A., WSFS BANK, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15706194), filed by TRUIST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KERNER, JUSTIN)
October 1, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Parties were entered as either Interpleader or Claimants. In the future, please use PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS when selecting party roles . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUIST BANK v. CMS ORDERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS ORDERS, LLC
Represented By: JEREMY JOHN ZACHARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALMA BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSFS BANK, N.A.
Represented By: WALTER WEIR, JR.
Represented By: DAVID V. DZARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTANDER BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTORS BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGNATURE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKELAND BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISRAEL DISCOUNT BANK OF NEW YORK
Represented By: ANTHONY M. VERNA, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, N.A.
Represented By: FRED W. HOENSCH
Represented By: JAMES P. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTCO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN COMMERCIAL BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH EAST COMMUNITY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: FRED W. HOENSCH
Represented By: JAMES P. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUIST BANK
Represented By: JUSTIN E. KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?