HINGSTON v. BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH
Plaintiff: Christopher Hingston
Defendant: BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH
Case Number: 3:2024cv11379
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2025 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Monmouth County Courthouse71 Monument ParkFreehold, NJ 07728-1266 State No: MON-L-003790-24. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jab)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER:The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's correspondence (ECF No. #3 ) and Defendant's response (ECF No. #5 ). This case was removed after the thirty-day removal period, and Defendant's response did not cite any case law for the proposition that assignment of a matter to a firm after expiration of the thirty-day removal period constitutes extraordinary circumstances to justify late removal. Moreover, in light of the direction that "the removal statute should be strictly construed and all doubts should be resolved in favor of remand," Abels v. State Farm Fire & Cas. Co., 770 F.2d 26, 29 (3d Cir. 1985), the Court finds that remand is appropriate. The Clerk of the Court shall remand this matter to the New Jersey Superior Court, Monmouth County, Law Division. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/7/2025. (jab)
January 7, 2025 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jab)
January 6, 2025 Filing 5 Letter from Mitchell B. Jacobs, Esq. re 4 Order, #3 Letter. (JACOBS, MITCHELL)
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff Christopher Hingston's correspondence requesting that the Court remand the matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey. (ECF No. #3 .) Defendant Borough of Bradley Beach shall e-file a response to the correspondence no later than Wednesday, January 8, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/31/2024. (jab)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 Letter from Christopher P. Lenzo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Affidavit of Service)(LENZO, CHRISTOPHER)
December 23, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/10/2025. (dmr3)
December 20, 2024 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to The Borough of Bradley Beach. Attorney MITCHELL B. JACOBS for BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH added. (JACOBS, MITCHELL)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH from Superior Court of New Jersey, Monmouth County, case number MON-L-3790-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15895632), filed by BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JACOBS, MITCHELL)
December 20, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINGSTON v. BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hingston
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. LENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF BRADLEY BEACH
Represented By: MITCHELL B. JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?