ABUNAMEH v. KUWAIT PROJECTS COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Qasem Abunameh
Defendant: Kuwait Projects Company and Jordan Kuwait Bank
Case Number: 3:2025cv00845
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Robert Kirsch
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2025 Filing 10 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (dmr3)
January 31, 2025 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3)
January 30, 2025 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
January 30, 2025 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-09882. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court transfers this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/30/2025) (sgz)
January 30, 2025 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey.(sgz)
January 27, 2025 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Sir/Madam from Mohammad Qasem Abunameh re: I am consent to transfer my case to the District of NJ. Document filed by Mohammad Qasem Abunameh.(rro)
January 17, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mohammad Qasem Abunameh. New Address: 661A Mapleview Dr., Old Bridge, NJ, 08857. (ar)
January 15, 2025 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Mohammad Qasem Abunameh 6614 Mapleview Drive Old Bridge, NJ 08857. (ne)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than January 27, 2025 as to why this action should not be transferred to the District of New Jersey. In the alternative, if Plaintiff is willing to transfer this action to the District of New Jersey, the Court requests that Plaintiff submit a letter stating that he consents to the transfer of this action to the District of New Jersey no later than January 20, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/13/25) (yv)
January 7, 2025 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Mohammad Qasem Abunameh 6614 Mapleview Drive Old Bridge, NJ 08857.
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may #consent to electronic service to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for #permission to file documents electronically. Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (nb)
January 6, 2025 CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see #Rule 9.2 of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(nb)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jordan Kuwait Bank, Kuwait Projects Company..(nb)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(nb)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jordan Kuwait Bank, Kuwait Projects Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 35662)Document filed by Mohammad Qasem Abunameh..(nb)
December 23, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (nb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABUNAMEH v. KUWAIT PROJECTS COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Qasem Abunameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuwait Projects Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Kuwait Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?