KARMIN v. ROGOVE et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: ALAN KARMIN
Defendant: ADRIENNE C. ROGOVE, NEAL BEVANS, NICOLE PINARD, ASPEN PUBLISHERS INC., CAROLINA ACADEMIC PRESS, AFFORDABLE PARALEGAL SERVICES, MICHAEL SAUNDERS, NEW JERSEY LAW JOURNAL, LAW 360, LEAGLE, VLEX, ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF PARALEGALS, TROYLAN & ASSOCIATES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Case Number: 3:2025cv01036
Filed: February 5, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Georgette Castner
Referring Judge: Justin T Quinn
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an extension of time until 4/25/2025 to answer, move, or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 4/9/2025. (jal, )
April 2, 2025 Filing 13 Letter from Defendant Alabama Association of Paralegals, Inc. re 12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. (FELDMAN, HARRIS)
April 2, 2025 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Alabama Association of Paralegals, Inc.. Attorney HARRIS NEAL FELDMAN for ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF PARALEGALS added. (FELDMAN, HARRIS)
March 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER Granting 10 Defendant's request for a brief extension of time until 4/25/2025 to answer, move, or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 3/31/2025. (amv)
March 31, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added KERRI E. CHEWNING as representing CAROLINA ACADEMIC PRESS in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr3)
March 28, 2025 Filing 10 Letter from Defendant Carolina Academic Press re 9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, 1 Complaint Received. (CHEWNING, KERRI)
March 27, 2025 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to R. CHRISTOPHER HUNTER. (Received via ADS) (dmr3)
March 27, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Alternate Service by ALAN KARMIN. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Envelope)(amv)
March 27, 2025 Set Deadlines as to 8 MOTION for Alternate Service. Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
March 27, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that although an individual is entitled to proceed pro se, a corporation must be represented by counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr3)
March 27, 2025 Clerk`s Text Order - The document 9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order has been DENIED. Application has been sent to chambers for review. (dmr3)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER denying request for alternate service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 2/27/2025. (jal, )
February 21, 2025 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Castner requesting alternate service from ALAN KARMIN. (Filed via ADS) (jal, )
February 21, 2025 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100, AFFORDABLE PARALEGAL SERVICES, ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF PARALEGALS, ASPEN PUBLISHERS INC., NEAL BEVANS, CAROLINA ACADEMIC PRESS, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, LAW 360, LEAGLE, NEW JERSEY LAW JOURNAL, NICOLE PINARD, ADRIENNE C. ROGOVE, MICHAEL SAUNDERS, TROYLAN & ASSOCIATES, VLEX ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100, filed by ALAN KARMIN.(dmr3)
February 21, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AFFORDABLE PARALEGAL SERVICES, ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF PARALEGALS, ASPEN PUBLISHERS INC., NEAL BEVANS, CAROLINA ACADEMIC PRESS, LAW 360, LEAGLE, NEW JERSEY LAW JOURNAL, NICOLE PINARD, ADRIENNE C. ROGOVE, MICHAEL SAUNDERS, TROYLAN & ASSOCIATES, VLEX. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
February 21, 2025 COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry 1 for complaint. (dmr3)
February 21, 2025 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number TRE142718 (dmr3)
February 6, 2025 Filing 3 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (dmr3)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (dmr3)
February 6, 2025 Notice of Judicial Preferences. Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3)
February 5, 2025 Filing 1 Complaint Received (Received via ADS). (dmr3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARMIN v. ROGOVE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN KARMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADRIENNE C. ROGOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEAL BEVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE PINARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN PUBLISHERS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA ACADEMIC PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFFORDABLE PARALEGAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SAUNDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY LAW JOURNAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW 360
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF PARALEGALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROYLAN & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?