v. HOOPES
Respondent: ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES
Case Number: 8:2019cv13698
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES, be and he hereby is disbarred and permanently restrained and enjoined from the practice of law before this Court pursuant to L.Civ.R.104.1(a)(4), effective immediately. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/12/2019. (jem)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/26/2019. No appearance/response from respondent. Court Ordered respondent be permanently suspended from practice before this Court and be stricken from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES re #2 Order to Show Cause,, (JB, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR TEMPORARY SUSPENSION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDERED, Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1 (a), ROBERT PATRICK HOOPES, be temporarily suspended from the practice of law before this Court; This Order shall remain in effect pending further disciplinary proceeding; and it is further ORDERED that respondent show cause, in writing, on or before 7/26/2019, as to why respondent shall not be permanently suspended from practice before this Court and be stricken from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/24/2019. (Ti)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Copy of Order D-19-18 of the Supreme Court of New Jersey temporarily suspending Respondent, ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES, from the practice of law pending the final resolution of ethics proceedings against him, effective immediately, and until further Order of the Court, etc. (Ti)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. HOOPES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES
Represented By: ROBERT PATRICK HOOPES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?