Duran, et al v. King, et al
Case Number: 1:1977cv00721
Filed: November 15, 1977
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3245 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Patricio David Ortegon's Motion for Reconsideration to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Doc. 3244) is denied. (kmt)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3243 ORDER DENYING MR. ORTIZ'S MOTION TO COMPLY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. John P. Ortiz's Motion to Comply (Doc. 3242) is denied. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of the Court's "Guide for Pro Se Litigants" to Mr. Ortiz. (kmt)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3238 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Patricio David Ortegon's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. 3222) is denied. The Clerk is directed to notify the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit of this denial. (kmt)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3229 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Doc. 3224) is denied. The parties are to submit simultaneous briefing regarding the application of paragraph 17 of the Second Revised Settlement Agreement to in-house parolees by 5/1/2020. Response briefs, if any, are due by 5/6/2020. (kmt)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3205 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SECOND REVISED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3182 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO STAY AND TERMINATE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Motions to Stay and Terminate of Messrs. Piedra, Duran, Peterson, Hunnicutt, Chris Williams, Kame, Acosta, Ruiz, Cordova, Clark, Feeney, Harrison, Perez, Riley, Chavez, Fredrick Williams, Wilson, Rhodes, Tunoa, and Young (Docs. 3093-95, 3097, 3099, 3102-03, 3105, 3133-40, 3158, 3165-68) are denied. (kmt)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3051 ORDER OF REFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales referring 3047 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tah)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3011 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 3010 Unopposed Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Emergency Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Postpone Automatic Stay. Defendants' response due on or before 12/31/2018; hearing on motion will be set prior to 1/4/2019. (tah)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2954 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 2948 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement Briefing. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief due 8/17/2018; Defendants' response due 8/31/2018; and Plaintiffs' reply due 9/17/2018. (tah)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2873 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 2872 Unopposed Motion to Appoint Class Counsel. (tah)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2830 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales to conduct hearings, if warranted, including evidentiary hearings, and to perform any legal analysis required to recommend to the Court an ultimate disposition of 2829 Joint Motion Requesting the Court to Enter Access Order. (tah)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2819 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting part and denying in part 2806 Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran, et al v. King, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?