Bergey, et al v. Boy Scouts of Amer Featured Case
Plaintiff: Linda Bergey and James R Bergey, Sr.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 1:2005cv00536
Filed: May 16, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: M. Christina Armijo
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge M. C. Armijo granting pltf's motion to dismiss [38-1] dismissing case w/prejudice (cc: all counsel) (ln)
August 11, 2006 Filing 38
MOTION by pltfs to dismiss complaint (ln)
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37
ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch to file closing documents by 08/25/06; all settings before Judge Lynch are vacated (cc: all counsel*) (ln)
July 3, 2006 Filing 36
SUPPLEMENT of Anticipated Witnesses by pltfs to Pretrial Order (td)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35
ORDER by District Judge M. C. Armijo granting deft's motion to extend deadline for submission of pretrial order [34-1] Pretrial order ddl 6/30/06 (cc: all counsel) (dmw)
June 23, 2006 Filing 34
MOTION by deft to extend deadline for submission of pre-trial order to the court until 06/30/06 * (ln)
June 20, 2006 Filing 33
NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF BRIEFING by deft of motion to dismiss [29-1] (ln)
June 19, 2006 Filing 32
REPLY by deft to pltfs' response to mtn for sum/jgm [29-1] (pr)
May 31, 2006 Filing 31
RESPONSE by deft to mtn for sum/jgm [29-1] (td)
May 12, 2006 Filing 30
MEMORANDUM by deft Boy Scouts of America in support of motion for summary judgment [29-1] (ln)
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28
ORDER by District Judge M. C. Armijo granting deft's motion to extend deadline to serve dispositive motions until 5/12/06 [26-1] (cc: all counsel) (seal)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27
ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch extending discovery deadline; [25-2] Discovery due on 4/28/06 (cc: all counsel) (yc)
March 29, 2006 Filing 26
MOTION by deft Boy Scouts of America to extend deadline to serve dispositive motions (ln)
March 27, 2006 Filing 25
CLERK'S MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch Status hearing held * (dmw)
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24
ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch Telephonic Status Conference set for 03/27/06 at 1:00 pm (cc: all counsel*) (ln)
March 9, 2006 Filing 23
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of supplemental response to deft's request for production regarding Request No. 19 to counsel on 3/8/06 (pz)
March 6, 2006 Filing 22
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of supplemental responses to deft's request for production nos. 2, 13 & 19 to counsel on 3/6/06 (pz)
March 1, 2006 Filing 21
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by deft Boy Scouts of America of supplemental answers and objections to pltfs' interrogatories and request for production to counsel on 03/01/06 (ln)
February 15, 2006 Filing 20
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of 12 photographs to include as Exhibit C to the response to deft's request for production to counsel on 2/15/06 (td)
February 10, 2006 Filing 19
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of answers to interrogs & request for production to counsel on 2/6/06 (td)
December 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 18
ORDER by District Judge M. C. Armijo granting joint motion to amend initial scheduling order & pretrial deadlines [16-1] Discovery cutoff 3/17/06; Motion Filing cutoff 4/14/06; Pretrial order del 6/26/06; Pretrial conference set on 9/5/06; Jury selection/trial set on 10/10/06 (cc: all counsel) (dmw)
December 16, 2005 Filing 17
CERTIFICATE by defendant of service of preliminary expert witness report to counsel on 12/16/05 (dmw)
December 15, 2005 Filing 16
JOINT MOTION to amend initial scheduling order & pretrial deadlines (dmw)
November 21, 2005 Filing 15
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of interrogs & request for production to counsel on 11/18/05 (pz)
November 18, 2005 Filing 14
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of expert witness disclosure to counsel on 11/18/05 (pz)
October 14, 2005 Filing 13
INITIAL PRE-TRIAL REPORT by District Judge M. C. Armijo and Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch; Discovery set for 1/15/06; mtn filing ddl set for 2/15/06; proposed pretrial order due 7/12/06; pretrial conference set for 9:00 am on 7/5/06; jury trial set for 9:00 am on 8/8/06; Estimated # of Trial Days: 14; Chances of Settlement: unknown (cc: all counsel) (dmw)
August 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12
AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch setting deadlines, as further described herein (cc: all counsel)* (dmw)
August 30, 2005 Filing 11
CERTIFICATE of service by pltfs of initial disclosures to counsel on 8/29/05 (pz)
August 17, 2005 Filing 9
CLERK'S MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch Rule 16 scheduling conference held * (dmw)
August 9, 2005 Filing 8
CERTIFICATE of service of initial disclosures to counsel on 8/4/05 by defendant (jm) Modified on 08/18/2005
July 26, 2005 Filing 7
PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by defendant, plaintiff (jm)
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch Telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference set on 8/16/05 @ 9:00 am; provisional discovery plan & IPTR due 8/2/05 (cc: all counsel*) (dmw)
June 7, 2005 Filing 5
DEMAND for jury trial by defendant (dmw)
May 25, 2005 Filing 3
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE for defendant by Alfred L. Green Jr. (dmw)
May 16, 2005 Filing 1
COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE RESULTING IN PERSONAL INJURIES (1 Summons(es) issued) (referred to Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch) (mjr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergey, et al v. Boy Scouts of Amer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bergey
Represented By: Patrick A. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Bergey, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick A. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Emily A. Franke
Represented By: Alfred L. Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?