Pueblo of Jemez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Jemez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2012cv00800
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Sandoval
Presiding Judge: Robert Hayes Scott
Presiding Judge: Alan C. Torgerson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 409 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 404 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 405 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 398 Memorandum Opinion and Order . by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order re 398 Memorandum Opinion and Order by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Final JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning. (cab)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying 237 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 238 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (cab)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning. IT IS ORDERED that the requests in the Plaintiff Pueblo of Jemez's Memorandum of Law: Native American Oral Traditional Evidence at 1, filed October 29, 2018 320 , are granted in part and denied in part. The Court will admit hearsay in American Indian oral tradition evidence only pursuant to the applicable hearsay exceptions enumerated in Federal Rule of Evidence 803. The Court will not admit Native American oral tradition evidence pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 807. (kg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 236 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Evidence by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting 234 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall deliver to Defendant all documents it has withheld on the basis of the legislative process privilege within ten (10) days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (mlt)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion to Compel. (mlt)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DENYING AS MOOT 200 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for Intra-District Transfer (yc)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting 162 Motion for Protective Order and denying 164 Motion to Strike. (mlt)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 143 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines amended as included herein. See Order for details. (mej)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting in part and deferring ruling in part 121 Motion to Amend/Correct. (mej)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION PRODUCED BY THE UNITED STATES by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pueblo of Jemez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Jemez
Represented By: Samuel D. Hough
Represented By: Thomas E. Luebben, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?