Abraham et al v. WPX Energy Production, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Steven J. Abraham and H Limited Partnership
Defendant: WPX Energy Production, LLC, Williams Partners L.P. and Williams GP LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00917
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Referring Judge: Alan C. Torgerson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2018 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
February 7, 2018 275 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/1/2018. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 3/8/2018 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at 877.810.9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
January 16, 2018 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Joint Status Report by 1/30/18 by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 30, 2017 272 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying the Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend and to Reconsider Memorandum Opinion and Order [Doc. 252] 255 and the Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Class Certification 256 .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham et al v. WPX Energy Production, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Abraham
Represented By: Michael J Condon
Represented By: Jake Eugene Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H Limited Partnership
Represented By: Michael J Condon
Represented By: Jake Eugene Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPX Energy Production, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Partners L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams GP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?