Front Range Equine Rescue et al v. Vilsack et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Sink, Front Range Equine Rescue, Deborah Trahan, Cassie Gross, Chief David Bald Eagle, The Humane Society of the United States, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Krystle Smith, Return to Freedom, Ramona Cordova, Marin Humane Society, Horses for Life Foundation, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Sandy Schaefer, Tanya Littlewolf and Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack and Alfred A. Almanza
Intervenor Defendant: Rains Natural Meats, New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Scenic View Ranch, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, United Horsemen, Doug and Judy Johnson, Chevaline, LLC, Kujyukuri, Ltd., International Equine Business Association, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., Bill and Jan Wood and Marcy Britton
Amicus Curiae: Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon
Intervenor: Valley Meat Company, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2013cv00639
Filed: July 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
0 Judge: M Christina Armijo
1 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER releasing funds by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv)
April 7, 2017 Filing 272 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Front Range Equine Rescue (Wagman, Bruce)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. Show Cause Response due by 4/10/2017. (kg)
February 27, 2017 Filing 269 MANDATE of USCA - the judgment is affirmed as to #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Judgment) (kg)
April 25, 2016 Filing 268 NOTICE TO USCA that Record is Complete re #264 Notice of Appeal. (vv)
April 25, 2016 Filing 267 NOTICE of Non-Designation of transcript of proceedings by Valley Meat Company, LLC re #264 Notice of Appeal, (vv)
April 11, 2016 Filing 266 USCA Information Letter with Case Number 16-2054 for #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (vv)
April 8, 2016 Filing 265 Transmission of Preliminary Record to US Court of Appeals re #264 Notice of Appeal (vv)
April 7, 2016 Filing Fee Received: $ 505 receipt number 1084-4512299 re #264 Notice of Appeal, filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dunn, A.)
April 7, 2016 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #263 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Bond, Order on Report and Recommendations by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Dunn, A.)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #257 ; denying motions #213 #215 by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #261 Motion to Withdraw (vv)
January 27, 2016 Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw of Rocky Unruh as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
January 26, 2016 Filing 260 NOTICE by Front Range Equine Rescue Notice of Entry of Appearance (Wolf, Samuel)
December 14, 2015 Filing 259 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO VALLEY MEAT'S OBJECTIONS TO RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION OF MOTIONS TO COLLECT ON INJUNCTION BONDS re #257 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC, #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C, #258 Objections to Report and Recommendations, filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Horses for Life Foundation, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Unruh, Rocky)
November 25, 2015 Filing 258 OBJECTIONS to #257 Report and Recommendations , filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC. Related document: #257 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC, #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Dunn, A.)
November 12, 2015 Filing 257 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa recommending that Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.'s Motion to Recover Injunction Bond (Doc. 213) and Valley Meat Company, L.L.C.'s Motion to Recover Rule 65(c) Security Bond (Doc. 215) be denied. Objections to Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition are due by 11/30/2015. (kmt)
September 25, 2015 Filing 256 BRIEF re #252 Order by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
September 25, 2015 Filing 255 BRIEF re #252 Order by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (Wagman, Bruce)
September 25, 2015 Filing 254 BRIEF re #252 Order Additional Briefing on Questions Raised in Court's September 11, 2015 Order by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Stephenson, Lisa)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: #215 MOTION TO RECOVER BOND, #213 MOTION to Recover Injunction Bond by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo (vv)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER for additional briefing by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo (vv)
August 21, 2015 Filing 251 Surreply to Responsible Transportation's and Valley Meat's Replies on Motions to Collect on Injunction Bond REPLY re #223 Reply to Response to Motion, #224 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo denying #232 Motion for Hearing (vv)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #227 Motion for Leave to File surreply (vv)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #231 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow terminated (lvm)
June 30, 2015 Filing 247 STATUS REPORT by State of New Mexico (Biernoff, Ari)
June 30, 2015 Filing 246 STATUS REPORT /Response to Arguments by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Stephenson, Lisa)
June 30, 2015 Filing 245 STATUS REPORT by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
June 24, 2015 Filing 244 NOTICE of amended clerk's minutes re #243 Telephonic Conference (vv)
June 23, 2015 Filing 243 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/23/2015. (caw)
June 23, 2015 Filing 242 STATUS REPORT for June 23 Status Conference by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (Wagman, Bruce)
June 16, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A Stephenson on behalf of Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Stephenson, Lisa)
June 15, 2015 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-4103002 re: # 240 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stephenson, Lisa)
June 15, 2015 Filing 240 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor Defendant Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. by Lisa A Stephenson (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stephenson, Lisa)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. Notice and Certification of Good Standing for Lisa Stephenson (Rogers, Patrick)
June 12, 2015 Filing 238 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. COUNSEL WISHING TO PARTICIPATE SHALL CALL THE COURT'S MEET ME CONFERENCE LINE AT 505-348-2317 TO PARTICIPATE IN THE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE(caw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 3, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. COUNSEL WISHING TO PARTICIPATE SHALL CALL THE COURT'S MEET ME CONFERENCE LINE AT 505-348-2317 TO PARTICIPATE IN THE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE(caw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 26, 2015 Filing 236 MANDATE of USCA as to #206 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(vv)
April 14, 2015 Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re #232 MOTION for Hearing re #223 Reply to Response to Motion, #94 Order on Motion for TRO, #214 Brief, #224 Reply to Response to Motion, #216 Brief, #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond , [22 filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
April 9, 2015 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition re #232 MOTION for Hearing re #223 Reply to Response to Motion, #94 Order on Motion for TRO, #214 Brief, #224 Reply to Response to Motion, #216 Brief, #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond , [22 filed by State of New Mexico. (Biernoff, Ari)
April 8, 2015 Filing 233 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
April 6, 2015 Filing 232 MOTION for Hearing re #223 Reply to Response to Motion, #94 Order on Motion for TRO, #214 Brief, #224 Reply to Response to Motion, #216 Brief, #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond , #225 Notice of Briefing Complete, #219 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #102 Order, #226 Notice of Briefing Complete,,, REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunn, A.)
September 2, 2014 Filing 231 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; Motion to Withdraw Kathryn Brack Morrow as Counsel by Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Budd-Falen, Karen)
May 9, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Plaintiffs re #227 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Tanya Littlewolf, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Cassie Gross, State of New Mexico, Deborah Trahan, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society (Wagman, Bruce)
April 28, 2014 Filing 229 RESPONSE to Motion re #227 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick)
April 28, 2014 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #227 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
April 11, 2014 Filing 227 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
April 8, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. re #221 MOTION to Amend/Correct #220 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND, #216 Brief, #219 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Agreed Extension of Time for Responsible Transporation, LLC's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., #220 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND, #216 Brief, #219 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Agreed Extension of Time for Responsible Transporation, LLC's Reply to Motion to Recover Injunc filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Rogers, Patrick)
April 7, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Valley Meat Company, LLC re #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
April 4, 2014 Filing 224 REPLY to Response to Motion re #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
April 4, 2014 Filing 223 REPLY to Response to Motion re #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond Brief In Support of It's Motion to Recover Injunction Bond filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Rogers, Patrick)
March 28, 2014 Filing 222 Agreed Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND, #216 Brief, #219 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.) Modified text text on 3/31/2014 (eh).
March 28, 2014 Filing 221 AGREED EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSIBLE TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S REPLY TO MOTION TO RECOVER INJUNCTION BOND #220 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND, #216 Brief, #219 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Agreed Extension of Time for Responsible Transporation, LLC's Reply to Motion to Recover Injunc , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick) Modified on 3/28/2014 (yc). (yc).
March 28, 2014 Filing 220 AGREED EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSIBLE TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S REPLY TO MOTION TO RECOVER INJUNCTION BON #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND, #216 Brief, #219 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Agreed Extension of Time for Responsible Transporation, LLC's Reply to Motion to Recover Injunction Bond by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick) Modified text on 3/28/2014 (yc).
March 14, 2014 Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND, #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond Plaintiffs' Combined Response in Opposition to Motions to Collect on Injunction Bond filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Wagman, Bruce)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott granting #217 Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response. (mg)
March 3, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response in Opposition to Responsible Transportation and Valley Meat's Motions to Collect on the Security Bond by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
February 25, 2014 Filing 216 BRIEF re #215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Ricardo De Los Santos Dkt 56-2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Ricardo De Los Santos Dkt. 119)(Dunn, A.)
February 25, 2014 Filing 215 MOTION for Bond TO RECOVER BOND by Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
February 18, 2014 Filing 214 BRIEF re #213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond In Support of by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Rogers, Patrick)
February 18, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION Responsible Transportation, LLC Motion to Recover Injunction Bond by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER of USCA-Vacating Temporary Stay and Temporary Injunctive Relief as to #206 Notice of Appeal. (eh)
November 15, 2013 Filing 211 BRIEFING SCHEDULE to USCA for brief by Appellant(s) re #206 Notice of Appeal,. (eh)
November 15, 2013 Filing 209 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan for the #206 Notice of Appeal, (Wagman, Bruce)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER of USCA-Issuing Temporary Stay of Case re #206 Notice of Appeal. (eh)
November 4, 2013 Filing 207 Transmission of Preliminary Record to US Court of Appeals re #206 Notice of Appeal, (eh)
November 1, 2013 Filing 210 USCA Information Letter with Case Number 13-2187 for #206 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Tanya Littlewolf, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Cassie Gross, State of New Mexico, Deborah Trahan, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society. (eh)
November 1, 2013 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 1084-3326549 re #206 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Tanya Littlewolf, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Cassie Gross, State of New Mexico, Deborah Trahan, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society (ln)
November 1, 2013 Filing 206 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #205 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Wagman, Bruce)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo (cab)
November 1, 2013 Filing 204 Emergency MOTION to Extend Injunction by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
October 29, 2013 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #200 MOTION for Reconsideration re #168 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #125 Order, #142 Order, #179 Order on Motion to Extend (other), #199 Order on Motion for Bond filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
October 29, 2013 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #200 MOTION for Reconsideration re #168 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #125 Order, #142 Order, #179 Order on Motion to Extend (other), #199 Order on Motion for Bond filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
October 22, 2013 Filing 201 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack Regarding Corrected Categorical Exclusion Decision Memorandum for Rains Natural Meats (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Corrected Categorical Exclusion Decision Memorandum for Rains Natural Meats)(Garner, Alison)
October 21, 2013 Filing 200 MOTION for Reconsideration re #168 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #125 Order, #142 Order, #179 Order on Motion to Extend (other), #199 Order on Motion for Bond by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott denying #180 Motion for Bond for Rains Natural Meats (ge)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo denying #184 ORDER on Motion for Supplement (cab)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott denying #181 Motion to Strike (ge)
October 15, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC re #180 MOTION for Bond For Rains Natural Meats (EXPEDITED) filed by Rains Natural Meats, Chevaline, LLC, Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
October 15, 2013 Filing 195 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Defendants re #184 MOTION for Supplement the Administrative Record with the Declaration of Dr. Daniel L. Engeljohn, Ph.D. filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack (Garner, Alison)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott denying #155 Motion to Compel (ge)
October 14, 2013 Filing 193 REPLY to Response to Motion re #180 MOTION for Bond For Rains Natural Meats (EXPEDITED) filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - City of Gallatin Letter to Rains)(Dunn, A.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 192 CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF ON THE MERITS re #170 Brief, #185 Response, #183 Response,, #172 Brief filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 2)(Wagman, Bruce)
October 10, 2013 Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re #184 MOTION for Supplement the Administrative Record with the Declaration of Dr. Daniel L. Engeljohn, Ph.D. filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Garner, Alison)
October 7, 2013 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION for Supplement the Administrative Record with the Declaration of Dr. Daniel L. Engeljohn, Ph.D. filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
October 7, 2013 Filing 189 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC re #181 MOTION to Amend/Correct /Strike MISREPRESENTATIONS IN PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR'S AMENDED OPENING BRIEFS filed by Rains Natural Meats, Chevaline, LLC, Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 188 REPLY to Response to Motion re #181 MOTION to Amend/Correct /Strike MISREPRESENTATIONS IN PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR'S AMENDED OPENING BRIEFS filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION for Bond For Rains Natural Meats (EXPEDITED) filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F)(Wagman, Bruce)
October 7, 2013 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 MOTION to Amend/Correct /Strike MISREPRESENTATIONS IN PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR'S AMENDED OPENING BRIEFS filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
September 27, 2013 Filing 185 RESPONSE BRIEF ON THE MERITS re #170 Brief, filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (House Report 1967 FMIA Amendment (Excerpts)), #2 Exhibit B (Senate Report 1967 FMIA Amendment (Excerpts)), #3 Exhibit C (FSIS Directive 1232.4))(Smith, Andrew)
September 27, 2013 Filing 184 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record with the Declaration of Dr. Daniel L. Engeljohn, Ph.D. by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Garner, Alison) Modified text on 9/27/2013 (eh).
September 27, 2013 Filing 183 RESPONSE ; Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Brief in Support of Agency Action re #170 Brief, filed by Marcy Britton, Chevaline, LLC, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Rains Natural Meats, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Valley Meat Company, LLC, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood. (Morrow, Kathryn)
September 27, 2013 Filing 182 ANSWER to Complaint from Plaintiff-Intervenor by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. Related document: #70 Intervenor Complaint.(Garner, Alison)
September 26, 2013 Filing 181 MOTION to Amend/Correct /Strike MISREPRESENTATIONS IN PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR'S AMENDED OPENING BRIEFS by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
September 26, 2013 Filing 180 MOTION for Bond For Rains Natural Meats (EXPEDITED) by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #178 ORDER on Motion to Extend (cab)
September 25, 2013 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Temporary Restraining Order Regarding Rains Natural Meats, to Modify Briefing Schedule, and to Vacate October 1, 2013 Evidentiary Hearing by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Garner, Alison)
September 24, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE by Marcy Britton, Chevaline, LLC, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Rains Natural Meats, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Valley Meat Company, LLC, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood re #176 Reply to Response to Motion,,, ; Notice of Filing Exhibits to Accompany Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order Dated August 29, 2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Morrow, Kathryn)
September 24, 2013 Filing 176 REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 MOTION to Compel ; Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order dated August 29, 2013 ;Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order Dated August 29, 2013 filed by Marcy Britton, Chevaline, LLC, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Rains Natural Meats, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Valley Meat Company, LLC, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood. (Morrow, Kathryn)
September 24, 2013 Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 MOTION to Compel ; Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order dated August 29, 2013 filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Garner, Alison)
September 24, 2013 Filing 174 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack of Lodging of Supplemental Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Supplemental Administrative Record Index, #2 Exhibit B--Engeljohn Declaration)(Garner, Alison)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/1/2013 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom. (ge)
September 23, 2013 Filing 172 Amended Opening Brief by State of New Mexico (Biernoff, Ari) Modified text on 9/24/2013 (eh).
September 23, 2013 Filing 171 NOTICE by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan re #170 Brief, 159 Order, (Wagman, Bruce)
September 23, 2013 Filing 170 BRIEF by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (Wagman, Bruce)
September 23, 2013 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #155 MOTION to Compel ; Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order dated August 29, 2013 filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo terminating #156 Motion to Amend/Correct. (lvm)
September 20, 2013 Filing 167 BRIEF re #151 Order for Position Letter by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (Wagman, Bruce)
September 20, 2013 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #156 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Court's Amended TRO filed by Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. (Boyd, John)
September 20, 2013 Filing 165 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Court's Amended TRO filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Andrew)
September 20, 2013 Filing 164 RESPONSE Position Letter re #151 Order filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick)
September 20, 2013 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re #156 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Court's Amended TRO filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick)
September 20, 2013 Filing 162 BRIEF re #151 Order for Position Letter from Defendant-Intervenor Valley Meat Company by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
September 20, 2013 Filing 161 RESPONSE in Opposition re #156 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Court's Amended TRO filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Rains)(Dunn, A.)
September 19, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Telephonic Status Conference, held on September 3, 2013, before Judge M. Christina Armijo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Goehl, Telephone number 505-348-2209. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Transcripts may be purchased from the court reporter and/or viewed (but not copied) at the Clerk's Office public terminal within the 90-day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 9/26/2013. Redaction Request due 10/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2013.(jg)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo directing Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenor to file an amended opening brief, which conforms in format to the requirements of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure and Olenhouse, on or before Monday, September 23, 2013 at noon. No additions or supplementation to the opening briefs are permitted, as this Order only relates to form. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](sls)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo requiring an expedited response to that portion of #155 MOTION to Compel ; Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order dated August 29, 2013 filed by Bill and Jan Wood, Rains Natural Meats, United Horsemen, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Chevaline, LLC, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Scenic View Ranch, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., Marcy Britton, Valley Meat Company, LLC, International Equine Business Association, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, which asks the Court to strike portions of the opening briefs as they relate to matters outside of the administrate record. Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenor's responses are due on or before Monday, September 23, 2013 at noon.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (sls)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo requiring an expedited response to #156 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Court's Amended TRO filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Tanya Littlewolf, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Cassie Gross, Deborah Trahan, Horses for Life Foundation, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Marin Humane Society. Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' responses are due on or before Friday, September 20, 2013 at noon.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (sls)
September 19, 2013 Filing 156 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Court's Amended TRO by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Wagman, Bruce)
September 18, 2013 Filing 155 MOTION to Compel ; Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Motion to Comply with the Court's Scheduling Order dated August 29, 2013 by Marcy Britton, Chevaline, LLC, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Rains Natural Meats, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Responsible Transportation, L.L.C., Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Valley Meat Company, LLC, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood. (Budd-Falen, Karen)
September 13, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack Re: Grant of Inspection for Rains Natural Meats, Gallatin, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Categorical Exclusion for Rains Natural Meats)(Smith, Andrew)
September 12, 2013 Filing 153 BRIEF Opening Brief on the Merits in Support of Permanent Injunction by State of New Mexico (Biernoff, Ari)
September 12, 2013 Filing 152 BRIEF Opening Brief on the Merits by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Wagman, Bruce)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER REQUIRING POSITION LETTERS by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott (ge)
September 9, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/08/2013, before Judge Scott. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bean & Associates, Telephone number 505-843-9494. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Transcripts may be purchased from the court reporter and/or viewed (but not copied) at the Clerk's Office public terminal within the 90-day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 9/16/2013. Redaction Request due 9/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013.(pg)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #144 ORDER on Motion to File Amicus Brief. Movant's amicus brief is due on or before October 3, 2013. See Fed. R. App. P. 29(e). The page limits must be in accordance with Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 29(d). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](sls)
September 6, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Adkin on behalf of Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon (Adkin, Adam)
September 6, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3244756 re: # 146 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bergen, Leander)
September 6, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3244734 re: # 145 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bergen, Leander)
September 6, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon (Bergen, Leander)
September 6, 2013 Filing 146 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Amicus Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon by Leander Bergen on behalf of: Adam T. Adkin Karnopp Petersen LLP 1201 NW Wall Street, Ste. 200Bend, OR 97701 541-382-3011 Fax 541-388-5410 ata@karnopp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bergen, Leander)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 6, 2013 Filing 145 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Amicus Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon by Leander Bergen on behalf of: John W. Ogan Karnopp Petersen LLP 1201 NW Wall Street, Ste. 200Bend, OR 97701 541-382-3011 Fax 541-388-5410 jwo@karnopp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bergen, Leander)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 6, 2013 Filing 144 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Bergen, Leander)
September 6, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Leander Bergen on behalf of Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon (Bergen, Leander)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo (sls)
September 3, 2013 Filing 141 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo: Status Conference held on 9/3/2013. (Court Reporter J. Goehl) (eh)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #105 Motion to Intervene [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](sls)
September 3, 2013 Filing 139 RESPONSE re #54 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Garner, Alison)
September 3, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood re #105 MOTION to Intervene ;Proposed Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Intervene filed by Bill and Jan Wood, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Doug and Judy Johnson, New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Kujyukuri, Ltd., Scenic View Ranch, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association (Morrow, Kathryn)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting in part #131 Motion to Expedite (sls)
August 29, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack of Lodging of the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Administrative Record Index, #2 Exhibit B--Engeljohn Declaration)(Garner, Alison)
August 28, 2013 Filing 135 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/3/2013 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. COUNSEL SHALL CALL THE COURT'S CONFERENCE LINE AT 1-877-336-1831 and enter Access Code: 6930090 TO PARTICIPATE IN THE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE.(cab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/3/2013 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. COUNSEL SHALL CALL THE COURT'S CONFERENCE LINE AT 1-877-336-1831 and enter Code: 6930090 TO PARTICIPATE IN THE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE(cab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2013 Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion re #131 Joint MOTION to Expedite and Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing with Hearing on the Merits (by Federal Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Wagman, Bruce)
August 26, 2013 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #126 Reply to Response to Motion,, (Surreply, per 130 ) filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Smith, Andrew)
August 26, 2013 Filing 131 Joint MOTION to Expedite and Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing with Hearing on the Merits (by Federal Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Proposed Order))(Smith, Andrew)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #129 Motion for Leave to File [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](sls)
August 23, 2013 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Smith, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack of Forthcoming Motion for Expedited Merits Briefing in Lieu of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Smith, Andrew)
August 22, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Plaintiffs re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Tanya Littlewolf, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Cassie Gross, Deborah Trahan, Horses for Life Foundation, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Marin Humane Society (Wagman, Bruce)
August 22, 2013 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 AMENDED ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting in part #5 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction (sls)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #123 Motion to Clarify. An Amended Order is filed contemporaneously herewith.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](sls)
August 21, 2013 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION to Clarify August 2, 2013 Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 94] by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Smith, Andrew)
August 21, 2013 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify TRO and Modify/Set Aside Bond Order filed by State of New Mexico. (Biernoff, Ari)
August 21, 2013 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
August 21, 2013 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Smith, Andrew)
August 21, 2013 Filing 119 DECLARATION re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review, #102 Order SECOND DECLARATION OF RICARDO DE LOS SANTOS by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
August 21, 2013 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review ; Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Temporary Restraining Order and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond filed by Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood. (Morrow, Kathryn)
August 21, 2013 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rogers, Patrick)
August 16, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan re #102 Order Requiring Injunction Bond (Wagman, Bruce)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo requiring an expedited response to #112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Tanya Littlewolf, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Cassie Gross, Deborah Trahan, Horses for Life Foundation, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Marin Humane Society. The Federal Defendants and Intervenors Valley Meat Company and Responsible Transportation are ordered to file their response on or before the noon hour on Wednesday, August 21, 2013.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (sls)
August 14, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Modify the TRO and Objection to Magistrate's Order Requiring Injunction Bond and Memo in Support Thereof - Request for Expedited Review by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
August 12, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3206453 re: # 111 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,,, filed by Bill and Jan Wood, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Doug and Judy Johnson, New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Kujyukuri, Ltd., Scenic View Ranch, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Morrow, Kathryn)
August 12, 2013 Filing 111 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor Defendants Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood by Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow on behalf of: Karen Budd-Falen Budd-Falen Law Offices, LLC Post Office Box 346Cheyenne, WY 82003 307.632.5105 Fax 307.637.3891 karen@buddfalen.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Morrow, Kathryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE by Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood ; Notice of Certification (Morrow, Kathryn)
August 9, 2013 Filing 109 Discovery Statement re #99 Order by Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation (Boyd, John) Modified linkage on 8/12/2013 (dmw).
August 9, 2013 Filing 108 Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.'s RESPONSE to August 6 Discovery Order Request for Discovery re #99 Order filed by Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.. (Rogers, Patrick)
August 9, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack re #99 Order (Garner, Alison)
August 9, 2013 Filing 106 RESPONSE Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Statement in Response re #99 Order filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, State of New Mexico, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
August 9, 2013 Filing 105 MOTION to Intervene ;Proposed Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Intervene by Marcy Britton, International Equine Business Association, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Scenic View Ranch, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, United Horsemen, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Bill and Jan Wood. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Supplement)(Morrow, Kathryn)
August 9, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow on behalf of International Equine Business Association, New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association, South Dakota Stockgrowers Association, Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Marcy Britton, Bill and Jan Wood, Leroy and Shirley Wetz, Doug and Judy Johnson, Kujyukuri, Ltd., United Horsemen, Scenic View Ranch (Morrow, Kathryn)
August 9, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC re #99 Order DISCOVERY STATEMENT REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING (Dunn, A.)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REQUIRING INJUNCTION BOND by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott (cl)
August 8, 2013 Filing 101 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott: Preliminary Injunction held on 8/8/2013. (Court Reporter Beverly Schleimer) (cl)
August 7, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Temporary Restraining Order, held on August 2, 2013, before Judge M, Christina Armijo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Goehl, Telephone number 505-348-2209. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Transcripts may be purchased from the court reporter and/or viewed (but not copied) at the Clerk's Office public terminal within the 90-day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 8/14/2013. Redaction Request due 8/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2013.(jg)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER regarding discovery by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott. Short and concise statement regarding discovery due to the Court on or before Friday, August 9, 2013 at 5 p.m. MST. (ge)
August 5, 2013 Filing 98 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott: Telephone Conference held regarding scheduling on 8/5/2013. (ge)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott. Hearing set for 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom. (ge)
August 2, 2013 Filing 96 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2013 re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Court Reporter J. Goehl) (dmw)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER setting telephonic hearing with Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott. Counsel are to call the Court's conference line, 505-348-2329, on Monday, August 5, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (MST). The telephone conference on Monday is for the limited purpose of selecting a telephonic hearing date to address the security bond. Judge Scott is available Thursday, August 8, 2013. (ge)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting in part #5 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction (sls)
August 1, 2013 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Stephenson, #2 Exhibit A)(Boyd, John)
August 1, 2013 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT re #56 Memorandum in Opposition, #55 Response in Opposition to Motion SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF RICARDO DE LOS SANTOS by Valley Meat Company, LLC (Dunn, A.)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #47 Motion to Intervene; granting #49 Motion to Intervene; granting #57 Motion to Intervene; granting #65 Motion to Intervene [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](cab)
July 31, 2013 Filing 89 DECLARATION re #5 , #54 Amended Complaint,,, by Sandy Schaefer (Wagman, Bruce)
July 30, 2013 Filing 87 JOINDER to #5 - Proposed Joinder to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction joined by Intervenor Plaintiff State of New Mexico. (Biernoff, Ari)
July 30, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State of New Mexico re #65 MOTION to Intervene (Biernoff, Ari)
July 30, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack of Lodging of Provisional Administrative Record (Garner, Alison)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #79 ORDER on Motion to Extend (sls)
July 29, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Rains Natural Meats, Chevaline, LLC re #49 MOTION to Intervene (Dunn, A.)
July 26, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Plaintiffs re #5 filed by Krystle Smith, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Barbara Sink, Marin Humane Society (Wagman, Bruce)
July 26, 2013 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Page Limit for Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Wagman, Bruce)
July 26, 2013 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Preliminary Injunction filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
July 25, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Defendants re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case (Related Cases) filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack (Garner, Alison)
July 25, 2013 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case (Related Cases) filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Garner, Alison)
July 22, 2013 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
July 22, 2013 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
July 22, 2013 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chief David Bald Eagle, Ramona Cordova, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Sandy Schaefer, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #68 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (sls)
July 22, 2013 Filing 71 DECLARATION re #57 MOTION to Intervene CV-00639 of James Stephenson.pdf by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation (Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Filing 70 "FILED IN ERROR" Proposed Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by State of New Mexico.(Fuqua, Scott) Modified text on 7/22/2013 (eh).
July 19, 2013 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Intervene filed by State of New Mexico. (Fuqua, Scott)
July 19, 2013 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Order)(Smith, Andrew)
July 19, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack re #66 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Agreement for Extension of Page Limit on Exhibits (Smith, Andrew)
July 19, 2013 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 [16.1] Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Daniel Engeljohn, Ph.D, #2 Exhibit B -- Endangered Species Act Decision Memo, #3 Exhibit C -- Denial of Petition, #4 Exhibit D, Part 1 -- GAO Report, #5 Exhibit D, Part 2 -- GAO Report)(Smith, Andrew)
July 19, 2013 Filing 65 MOTION to Intervene by State of New Mexico. (Fuqua, Scott)
July 19, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE by State of New Mexico - Notice of Appearance by Ari Biernoff on behalf of the State of New Mexico (Fuqua, Scott)
July 19, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3173676 re: # 63 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3173675 re: # 62 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3173672 re: # 61 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, 62 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, 63 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Filing 63 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor Defendant The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation by David H Urias on behalf of: John G. Dillard Olsson Frank Weeda Terman Matz PC 600 New Hampshire Ave NW, Suite 500Washington, DC 20037 202-789-1212 Fax 202-234-3550 jdillard@ofwlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Urias, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 7/30/2013 (dmw).
July 19, 2013 Filing 62 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor Defendant The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation by David H Urias on behalf of: Stewart D. Fried Olsson Frank Weeda Terman Matz PC 600 New Hampshire Ave NW, Suite 500Washington, DC 20037 202-789-1212 Fax 202-234-3550 sfried@ofwlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Urias, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 7/30/2013 (dmw).
July 19, 2013 Filing 61 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor Defendant The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation by David H Urias on behalf of: Gary H. Baise Olsson Frank Weeda Terman Matz PC 600 New Hampshire Ave NW, Suite 500Washinton, DC 20037 202-789-1212 Fax 202-234-3550 gbaise@ofwlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Urias, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 7/30/2013 (dmw).
July 19, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation of Certification of Good Standing (Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F Egolf, Jr on behalf of Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife (Egolf, Brian)
July 19, 2013 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION to Intervene by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. (Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION to Intervene by The Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. (Urias, David)
July 19, 2013 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #55 Response in Opposition to Motion Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats, Valley Meat Company, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tom Vilsack, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Alfred A. Almanza. adding Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer, Tanya Littlewolf, Chief David Bald Eagle, Chief Arvol Looking Horse and Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Chief David Bald Eagle, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Tanya Littlewolf, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife and Sandy Schaefer, Chief David Bald Eagle, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Tanya Littlewolf, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife and Sandy Schaefer., filed by Ramona Cordova, Horses for Life Foundation, Deborah Trahan, Front Range Equine Rescue, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Return to Freedom, Cassie Gross, Barbara Sink, Marin Humane Society, Chief David Bald Eagle, Chief Arvol Looking Horse, Tanya Littlewolf, Roxanne Talltree-Douglas, Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife, Sandy Schaefer.(Wagman, Bruce)
July 19, 2013 Filing 53 DECLARATION re #49 MOTION to Intervene DECLARATION OF A. BLAIR DUNN by Rains Natural Meats (Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 52 DECLARATION re #50 Memorandum in Support, #49 MOTION to Intervene DECLARATION OF DAVID RAINS by Rains Natural Meats (Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 51 DECLARATION re #50 Memorandum in Support, #49 MOTION to Intervene DECLARATION OF SUE WALLIS by Chevaline, LLC (Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support re #49 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chevaline, LLC, Rains Natural Meats. (Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION to Intervene by Rains Natural Meats, Chevaline, LLC. (Dunn, A.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Support re #47 MOTION to Intervene filed by Responsible Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration)(Rogers, Patrick)
July 19, 2013 Filing 47 MOTION to Intervene by Responsible Transportation. (Rogers, Patrick)
July 19, 2013 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 filed by Responsible Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Patrick)
July 17, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2013 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (cab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2013 Filing 44 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo: Status Conference held on 7/15/13-7/16/2013. (Court Reporter J. Goehl) (eh)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Valley Meat Company, LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cab) Modified text on 7/17/2013 (eh).
July 15, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Continuation of Telephonic Conference SET for 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. COUNSEL SHALL CALL THE COURT'S MEET ME CONFERENCE LINE AT 505-348-2317 TO PARTICIPATE IN THE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE(cab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 14, 2013 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case (Related Cases) filed by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce)
July 13, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: A. Blair Dunn substituted for Michael Joseph Van Zandt (Dunn, A.)
July 12, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION to Transfer Case (Related Cases) by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Excerpt from ND Calif. Local Rules))(Smith, Andrew)
July 12, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/15/2013 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - before Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. COUNSEL SHALL CALL THE COURT'S MEET ME CONFERENCE LINE AT 505-348-2317 TO PARTICIPATE IN THE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE(cab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 12, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan re 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, (Certification) (Unruh, Rocky)
July 11, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocky N Unruh on behalf of Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (Unruh, Rocky)
July 11, 2013 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-3160434 re: # 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Krystle Smith, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Barbara Sink, Marin Humane Society (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wagman, Bruce)
July 11, 2013 Filing 35 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan by Bruce Wagman (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wagman, Bruce)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 11, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (T.R.O. Information Sheet) (Unruh, Rocky)
July 11, 2013 Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo and Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott assigned. (ln)
July 10, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A Smith on behalf of Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack (Smith, Andrew)
July 10, 2013 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:13-cv-03034. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 31, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received 7/10/2013. (rw)
July 10, 2013 Electronically transferred case to the District of New Mexico (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO DISTRICT OF NEW MEXICO re #30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Transferring Action to District of New Mexico filed by Krystle Smith, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Barbara Sink, Marin Humane Society, ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 10, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Transferring Action to District of New Mexico filed by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DECISION ON MOTION TO INTERVENE AND STRIKING INTERVENOR COMPLAINT re #23 Intervenor Complaint filed by Valley Meat Company LLC, ; #28 MOTION to Expedite Decision on Motion to Intervene and Motion for Telephonic Appearance by A. Blair Dunn, Esq. for Valley Meat Company LLC filed by Valley Meat Company LLC.Plaintiffs to respond to Motion to Intervene by 7/18/13 at noon PST. Hearing on Motion to Intervene is set 7/19/13 at 10:00am. Motion for Telephonic Appearance of A. Blair Dunn at 7/19/13 hearing is DENIED. Clerk shall strike Dkt. no. 23 from the record. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 9, 2013 Filing 28 MOTION to Expedite Decision on Motion to Intervene and Motion for Telephonic Appearance by A. Blair Dunn, Esq. for Valley Meat Company LLC; (Proposed) Order filed by Valley Meat Company LLC. (Van Zandt, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 27 Declaration of A. Blair Dunn in Support of #24 MOTION to Intervene filed byValley Meat Company LLC. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Van Zandt, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 26 Declaration of Ricardo De Los Santos in Support of #24 MOTION to Intervene filed byValley Meat Company LLC. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Van Zandt, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Intervene by Valley Meat Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B & E Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, B, & E Part 2)(Van Zandt, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Valley Meat Company LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 10:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/22/2013. Replies due by 7/29/2013. (Van Zandt, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2013)[Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.] Modified to reactivate motion on 7/11/2013 (rw).
July 8, 2013 Filing 23 Intervenor COMPLAINT and Motion to Dismiss Valley Meat Company, LLC. Filed byValley Meat Company LLC. (Van Zandt, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, In the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack. Responses due by 7/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A--Engeljohn Declaration, #3 Exhibit B--Directive, #4 Exhibit C--Valley Meat Decision Memo, #5 Exhibit D--Responsible Transportation Decision Memo, #6 Exhibit E--Communications, #7 Exhibit F--New Mexico Complaint, #8 Exhibit G--New Mexico Motion, #9 Exhibit H--New Mexico Brief)(Garner, Alison) (Filed on 7/8/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued as to USA (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/8/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #16 Errata, filed by Krystle Smith, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan, Front Range Equine Rescue, Ramona Cordova, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Barbara Sink, Marin Humane Society, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 Errata, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 7/12/2013. Replies due by 7/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 10:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 7/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 3, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Alison D Garner and Andrew A. Smith as Counsel, filed by Alfred A. Almanza, Elizbeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack (Garner, Alison) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/5/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING #7 Motion for Leave to File Oversized Motion. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 07/03/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/5/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 17 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2013 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order - YGR)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 16 ERRATA (AMENDED) to Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/2/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 15 ERRATA to Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 7/2/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 14 LETTER from Bruce A. Wagman to USDC dated 7/2/13. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 13 EXHIBITS 2 through 27 re #6 Declaration in Support, filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #6 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 12 EXHIBIT 1 (Part 5 of 5) re #6 Declaration in Support, filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #6 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #1 Exhibits 59-61, #2 Exhibits 62-63, #3 Exhibit 64) (cp, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2013: #4 Exhibit 65, #5 Exhibit 66 (part 1), #6 Exhibit 66 (part 2)) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 11 EXHIBIT 1 (Part 4 of 5) re #6 Declaration in Support, filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #6 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #1 Exhibit 52) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 10 EXHIBIT 1 (Part 3 of 5) re #6 Declaration in Support, filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #6 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibits 48-49, #3 Exhibit 50) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 9 EXHIBIT 1 (Part 2 of 5) re #6 Declaration in Support, filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #6 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #1 Exhibit 39, #2 Exhibit 40, #3 Exhibit 41, #4 Exhibits 42-45) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 8 EXHIBIT 1 (Part 1 of 5) re #6 Declaration in Support, filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #6 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #1 Exhibits 2-14, #2 Exhibits 15-21) (cp, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #3 Exhibits 22-24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibits 26-32) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction in Excess of Page Limits; DECLARATION of Bruce A. Wagman; [Proposed] Order filed by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Bruce Wagman in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byRamona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (Related document(s) #5 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2013: #1 Proposed Order) (farS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.] Modified on 7/11/2013 (rw).
July 2, 2013 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ramona Cordova, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cassie Gross, Horses for Life Foundation, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, The Humane Society of the United States, Deborah Trahan (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 2 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #17 *** ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) Modified on 7/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Alfred A. Almanza, Elizabeth A. Hagen, Tom Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611087448.). Filed byRamona Cordova, The Humane Society of the United States, Horses for Life Foundation, Return to Freedom, Deborah Trahan, Cassie Gross, Front Range Equine Rescue, Barbara Sink, Krystle Smith, Marin Humane Society. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2013: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (farS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Front Range Equine Rescue et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sink
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Front Range Equine Rescue
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Trahan
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Gross
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief David Bald Eagle
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Arvol Looking Horse
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle Smith
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Return to Freedom
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Cordova
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin Humane Society
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horses for Life Foundation
Represented By: Rocky N Unruh
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Talltree-Douglas
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Schaefer
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Littlewolf
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundation to Protect New Mexico Wildlife
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Rains Natural Meats
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: New Mexico Cattlegrowers' Association
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Scenic View Ranch
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Leroy and Shirley Wetz
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: United Horsemen
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Doug and Judy Johnson
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Chevaline, LLC
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Kujyukuri, Ltd.
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: International Equine Business Association
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Represented By: John G Dillard
Represented By: David H Urias
Represented By: Stewart D Fried
Represented By: John W. Boyd
Represented By: Gary H Baise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Ranchers-Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: South Dakota Stockgrowers Association
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Responsible Transportation, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lisa A Stephenson
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Bill and Jan Wood
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Marcy Britton
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Hagen
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred A. Almanza
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon
Represented By: John W Ogan
Represented By: Adam T. Adkin
Represented By: Leander Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Valley Meat Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Van Zandt
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?